Green v. Swedish Health Services
Plaintiff: Riccardo Green
Defendant / Appellant: Swedish Health Services
Case Number: 2:2021cv01286
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE, by Defendant Swedish Health Services, to #7 MOTION to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hammond, Ryan)
October 22, 2021 Filing 8 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Riccardo Green. (SR)
October 22, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand, filed by Plaintiff Riccardo Green. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/19/2021 (SR)
September 29, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint; by Swedish Health Services.(Hammond, Ryan)
September 24, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE ENTRY SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT DATES All counsel and any pro se parties are directed to meet and confer and to provide the Court with a combined Joint Status Report (the Report) by the deadline set below. This meet-and-confer must be a face-to-face meeting or a telephonic conference. If the parties are unable to agree on any part of the Report, they may answer in separate paragraphs; no separate reports are to be filed. The Report must contain the following information: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; and 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation.The deadlines below may be extended only by court order. Any request for extension of these deadlines should be made by email to Courtroom Deputy Clerk Gabriel Traber at gabriel_traber@wawd.uscourts.gov. The parties who have appeared in this matter must meet and confer before contacting the Court to request an extension. If this case involves claims that are exempt from the requirements of FRCP 26(a) and 26(f), please notify the Courtroom Deputy Clerk. Please note: Initial Disclosures are not to be filed. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/18/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/25/2022, Joint Status Report due by 2/1/2022. Cc to platinff via US Mail. (GT)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. Cc to plaintiff via US Mail. (GT)
September 23, 2021 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SG)
September 23, 2021 U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (SG)
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Western HealthConnect for Swedish Health Services. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Swedish Health Services (Hammond, Ryan)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 21-2-11567-1; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7261514) Attorney Ryan Paul Hammond added to party Swedish Health Services(pty:dfta), filed by Swedish Health Services. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit 1-7)(Hammond, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Swedish Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riccardo Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Swedish Health Services
Represented By: Ryan Paul Hammond
Represented By: Breanne Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?