Milton v. Coast Professional Inc
Plaintiff: Ronald Milton, Jr. and Ronald Milton, Jr
Defendant: Coast Professional, Inc. and Coast Professional Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv01312
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Coast Professional Inc (Vollans, Ryan)
November 22, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Coast Professional Inc.(Vollans, Ryan)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 12/9/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/18/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/2/2021. (AD)
November 3, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ryan W Vollans on behalf of Defendant Coast Professional Inc. (Vollans, Ryan)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Coast Professionals Inc (SG)
September 28, 2021 Judge James L. Robart added. (SG)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Coast Professional, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7266615) Attorney Ryan Lee McBride added to party Ronald Milton, Jr.(pty:pla), filed by Ronald Milton, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Coast Summons)(McBride, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milton v. Coast Professional Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Milton, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan Lee McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Milton, Jr
Represented By: Ryan Lee McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coast Professional, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coast Professional Inc
Represented By: Ryan W Vollans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?