Puentes v. Amazon.com Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Alejandro Garcia Puentes
Defendant: Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon Flex, Does 1 through 20, inclusive and Amazon Logistics Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv01370
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER re #52 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Miranda Rowley for defendants Amazon Logistics Inc and Amazon.com Services LLC, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER re #51 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Max C. Fischer for defendants Amazon Logistics Inc and Amazon.com Services LLC, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER re #53 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Richard G Rosenblatt for defendants Amazon Logistics Inc and Amazon.com Services LLC, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER re #50 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney James Walsh, Jr for defendants Amazon Logistics Inc and Amazon.com Services LLC, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER re #49 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Brian D Fahy for defendants Amazon Logistics Inc and Amazon.com Services LLC, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER re #48 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Brian D Berry for defendants Amazon Logistics Inc and Amazon.com Services LLC, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
November 10, 2021 Filing 53 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Richard G. Rosenblatt FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7329109 (Redekopp, Ryan)
November 10, 2021 Filing 52 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Miranda M. Rowley FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7329093 (Redekopp, Ryan)
November 10, 2021 Filing 51 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Max Fischer FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7329088 (Redekopp, Ryan)
November 10, 2021 Filing 50 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY James P. Walsh, Jr. FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7329081 (Redekopp, Ryan)
November 10, 2021 Filing 49 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Brian D. Fahy FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7329077 (Redekopp, Ryan)
November 10, 2021 Filing 48 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Brian D. Berry FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7329068 (Redekopp, Ryan)
November 5, 2021 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ryan Drew Redekopp on behalf of Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC. (Redekopp, Ryan)
October 8, 2021 Filing 46 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour, as related to CV16-1554 JCC. Hon. Brian A Tsuchida no longer assigned to case. (TF)
October 7, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 10/14/2021. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (AQ) Modified on 10/8/2021 - Docket entry is stricken per chambers. (AQ).
October 7, 2021 Filing 44 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from Central District of California, (Western Division) Los Angeles and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (RE)
October 7, 2021 Filing 43 Case transferred in from District of California Central, Case Number 2:21-cv-00414.
October 7, 2021 Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (RE)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, OR INTHE ALTERNATIVE, TO DISMISS, TRANSFER, OR STAY ACTION UNDER FIRST-TO-FILE RULE #17 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: GRANTS in part Defendants Motion. The action is hereby transferred to the Western District of Washington. All deadlines shall be vacated with any new deadlines to be set by the United States District Court for the Western District of Washington. This order does not limit or affect Defendants' ability to file any motions, including a motion to compel arbitration, or other pleading in response to the Complaint. Entire action electronically Transferred to USDC Western District of Washington on 9/30/2021. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) Modified on 9/30/2021 (lc). [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]
September 22, 2021 Filing 41 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ramin R Younessi counsel for Plaintiff Alejandro Garcia Puentes. Adding Jason J. Buccat as counsel of record for Plaintiff Alejandro Garcia Puentes for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Alejandro Garcia Puentes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Younessi, Ramin) [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]
September 22, 2021 Filing 40 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ramin R Younessi counsel for Plaintiff Alejandro Garcia Puentes. Adding Mae-Elaine Delos Santos as counsel of record for Plaintiff Alejandro Garcia Puentes for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Alejandro Garcia Puentes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Younessi, Ramin) [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]
September 13, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority Regarding Defendants' Motions, In the Alternative, to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings, or Dismiss, Transfer, or Stay Action Under First to File Rule (Dkt. 17) filed by Defendants Amazon Flex, Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Holecek, Michael) [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]
September 2, 2021 Filing 38 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ramin R Younessi counsel for Plaintiff Alejandro Garcia Puentes. Liliuokalani H. Martin is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Plaintiff. (Younessi, Ramin) [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE RULE 26 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE #36 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. The court orders that: 1. The Rule 26 Scheduling Conference is continued to October 22, 2021, at 1:00 p.m.; and 2. The Parties shall submit a Joint Rule 26(f) Report 14 days before the continued Scheduling Conference. (lom) [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]
August 4, 2021 Filing 36 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Rule 26 Scheduling Conference from 8/20/21 to 10/22/21 filed by Defendants Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Holecek, Michael) [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha re Stipulation to Continue, #34 . The document is STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order for the following reason(s): Other error(s) with document(s): Signature Attestation pursuant to Local Rule 5-4.3.4(a)(2) missing from Stipulation. Improper signature block for Judge. See Judge's standing order. (jre) [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]
August 3, 2021 Filing 34 STRICKEN PER #35 - Joint STIPULATION to Continue Rule 26 Scheduling Conference from 08/20/2021 to 10/22/2021 filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Continue the Rule 26 Scheduling Conference)(Holecek, Michael) Modified on 8/4/2021 (jre). [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]
July 23, 2021 Filing 33 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ramin R Younessi counsel for Plaintiff Alejandro Garcia Puentes. Zekiah N. Wright is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Alejandro Garcia Puentes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Younessi, Ramin) [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]
July 15, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority Regarding Defendants' Motions, in the Alternative, to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings, or Dismiss, Transfer, or Stay Action Under First to File Rule (Dkt. 17) filed by Defendants Amazon Flex, Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC. (Holecek, Michael) [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE RULE 26 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FROM JUNE 25,2021 1:00 PM TO AUGUST 20, 2021 AND PARTIES SUMBIT A JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT 14 DAYS BEFORE THE CONTINUED SCHEDULING CONFERNCE #29 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: (lc) Modified on 6/14/2021 (lc). [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]
June 11, 2021 Filing 30 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 10 days, filed by Defendants Amazon Flex, Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC.. (Holecek, Michael) [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]
June 7, 2021 Filing 29 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Rule 26 Scheduling Conference from June 25, 2021 to August 20, 2021 filed by Defendants Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Holecek, Michael) [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION UNDER SUBMISSION #17 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The Court finds that the Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings, or in the Alternative, Dismiss, Transfer, or Stay Action Under First to File Rule currently scheduled for hearing on April 16, 2021, is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, this motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. No appearances are necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]
April 2, 2021 Filing 27 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #17 (Second) filed by Defendants Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Proposed Order)(Holecek, Michael) [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]
April 2, 2021 Filing 26 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #17 filed by Defendants Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC. (Holecek, Michael) [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]
March 26, 2021 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #17 filed by Plaintiff Alejandro Garcia Puentes. (Younessi, Ramin) [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]
March 26, 2021 Filing 24 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Alejandro Garcia Puentes, identifying Alejandro Garcia Puentes. (Younessi, Ramin) [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEFENDANT AMAZON'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION HEARING FROM APRIL 2, 2021 1:30 PM #17 TO APRIL 16, 2021; OPPOSTION BE FILED BY MARCH 26, 2021; REPLY BE FILED BY APRIL 2, 2021 #21 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha (lc) [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Scheduling Conference set for 6/25/2021 at 01:00 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (gga) [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]
March 16, 2021 Filing 21 STIPULATION to Continue MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION HEARING from APRIL 2, 2021 to APRIL 16, 2021 Re: Request for Judicial Notice,, #18 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #17 filed by Plaintiff Alejandro Garcia Puentes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPLUATION TO CONTINUE AMAZONS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION HEARING FROM APRIL 2, 2021 TO APRIL 16, 2021)(Younessi, Ramin) [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]
March 15, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #17 filed by Defendants Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Amended))(Holecek, Michael) [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND AMAZON DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT TO MARCH 24, 2021 #14 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha (lc) [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]
February 22, 2021 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #17 and Stay Proceedings, or Dismiss, Transfer, or Stay Action Under First To File Rule filed by Defendants Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Proposed Order)(Holecek, Michael) [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]
February 22, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendants Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC. Motion set for hearing on 4/2/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexa Hawrysz in Support of Defendants Amazon.com Services LLC and Amazon.com Logistics, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings, or Dismiss, Transfer, or Stay Action Under First To File Rule, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order) (Holecek, Michael) [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]
February 19, 2021 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #15 served on February 19, 2021. (Holecek, Michael) [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (rrey) [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]
February 16, 2021 Filing 14 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to March 24, 2021 re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendants Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Holecek, Michael) [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]
February 1, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Removal with the State Court filed by Defendants Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC. (Holecek, Michael) [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case DECLINED by Judge Andre Birotte Jr, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:17-cv-02515-AB-RAOx (aco) [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]
January 21, 2021 Filing 11 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Amazon.com Services LLC answer now due 2/22/2021; Amazon Logistics, Inc. answer now due 2/22/2021, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendants Amazon.com Services LLC; Amazon Logistics, Inc..(Holecek, Michael) [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]
January 21, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ramin R Younessi counsel for Plaintiff Alejandro Garcia Puentes. Adding Zekiah N. Wright as counsel of record for Plaintiff Alejandro Garcia Puentes for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Alejandro Garcia Puentes. (Younessi, Ramin) [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]
January 21, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ramin R Younessi counsel for Plaintiff Alejandro Garcia Puentes. Adding Liliuokalani H. Martin as counsel of record for Plaintiff Alejandro Garcia Puentes for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Alejandro Garcia Puentes. (Younessi, Ramin) [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]
January 19, 2021 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #6 served on January 19, 2021. (Holecek, Michael) [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]
January 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]
January 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]
January 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Amazon Flex, Amazon.com Services LLC. Related Case(s): WAWD Case 2:16-cv-1554-JCC; USDC Central 17-cv-02515-AB; USDC Central 19-cv-00207-AB; USDC Northern 19-cv-00218-JSC; USDC Northern 17-cv-02219-RS; SDSC 37-2017-0029426; OCSC 30-2017-938102; ACSC RG 18923557; USDC Northern 19-cv-00288-RS; OCSC 30-2018-1031789; LASC 19STCV08098; SBCSC CIVDS1908923; LASC 19STCV15965; USDC Northern 3:20-cv-07792-VC (Holecek, Michael) [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]
January 15, 2021 Filing 4 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Amazon Flex, Amazon.com Services LLC, identifying Amazon.com, Inc.. (Holecek, Michael) [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]
January 15, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Amazon Flex, Amazon.com Services LLC identifying Amazon.com, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Holecek, Michael) [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]
January 15, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Amazon Flex, Amazon.com Services LLC. (Holecek, Michael) [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]
January 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV43846 Receipt No: ACACDC-30063928 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Amazon Flex, Amazon.com Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Holecek in Support of Defendants Amazon.com Services LLC's and Amazon Logistics, Inc.'s (erroneously sued as Amazon Flex, a business entity of unknown form) Notice of Removal of Class Action, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Proof of Service) (Attorney Michael J Holecek added to party Amazon Flex(pty:dft), Attorney Michael J Holecek added to party Amazon.com Services LLC(pty:dft))(Holecek, Michael) [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]
January 15, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Amazon Flex, Amazon.com Services LLC, Does, Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Alejandro Garcia Puentes. (filed in state court 11/13/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 3) (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]
January 15, 2021 COPY OF NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS executed by Plaintiff Alejandro Garcia Puentes, upon Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC served on 12/17/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC, Agent for Service of Process by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 10) (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 10/7/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Puentes v. Amazon.com Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Garcia Puentes
Represented By: Jason James Buccat
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Represented By: Liliuokalani Martin
Represented By: Mae-Elaine Q Del Santos
Represented By: Ramin R Younessi
Represented By: Zekiah N Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services LLC
Represented By: Lauren M. Blas
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Represented By: Megan M Cooney
Represented By: Michael J. Holecek
Represented By: Brian D Berry
Represented By: Brian D Fahy
Represented By: James Walsh, Jr.
Represented By: Max C. Fischer
Represented By: Miranda Rowley
Represented By: Richard G Rosenblatt
Represented By: Ryan Drew Redekopp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Flex
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Logistics Inc
Represented By: Lauren M. Blas
Represented By: Megan M Cooney
Represented By: Michael J. Holecek
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Represented By: Brian D Berry
Represented By: Brian D Fahy
Represented By: James Walsh, Jr.
Represented By: Max C. Fischer
Represented By: Miranda Rowley
Represented By: Richard G Rosenblatt
Represented By: Ryan Drew Redekopp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?