Baillie v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Debbie J Baillie
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2021cv01418
Filed: October 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: S Kate Vaughan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2021 Filing 11 EXHIBIT re #3 Complaint by Plaintiff Debbie J Baillie (MW)
December 1, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT by all parties to proceed before a Magistrate Judge per #5 Consent Form. Case remains assigned to Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. (KMP)
December 1, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Katherine B. Watson on behalf of Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Watson, Katherine)
November 10, 2021 Filing 8 Summonses #4 , [4-1], [4-2] Electronically Issued and Emailed to defendant Commissioner of Social Security per #7 Order Directing Service. (KMP)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. Documents to be served electronically to Commissioner of Social Security on 11/10/2021. (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) (KMP) Modified on 11/10/2021 to add cc. (KMP)
November 9, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER re #2 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) (KMP) Modified on 11/10/2021 to add cc. (KMP)
October 20, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 11/10/2021. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) (KMP)
October 20, 2021 Filing 4 Summonses Issued in Paper Form as to defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Summons USAG, #2 Summons USAO)(cc: Plaintiff via USPS)(KMP)
October 20, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Receipt # IFP Granted), filed by Debbie J Baillie. (KMP)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis signed by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) (KMP)
October 18, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge S Kate Vaughan, filed by Debbie J Baillie. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(CDA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baillie v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie J Baillie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe
Represented By: Katherine B. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?