Slaughter v. White
Petitioner: Ossie Lee Slaughter
Respondent: Daniel White
Case Number: 2:2021cv01421
Filed: October 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Fricke
Referring Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2021 ***Consent Deadline terminated. Case remains assigned to Judge James L Robart and referred to Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869)(GMR)
December 2, 2021 Filing 17 STATE COURT RECORD filed by Respondent Daniel White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-9)**PRINT NEF ONLY: Documents will be served in paper form.**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869)(Hines, Keith)
December 2, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #5 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Daniel White. Noting Date 12/27/2021, **PRINT ALL**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869)(Hines, Keith)
November 4, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Change of Address Filed by Petitioner Ossie Lee Slaughter. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869) (AMD)
October 27, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Keith A Hines on behalf of Respondent Daniel White. **PRINT ALL**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869)(Hines, Keith)
October 25, 2021 Filing 13 Mail addressed to Ossie Lee Slaughter returned as Undeliverable re #7 Order for Service and Answer, 28 U.C.S. 2254 Petition. (Dkt. 7 regenerated) **2 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869)(SP)
October 25, 2021 Filing 12 Mail addressed to Ossie Lee Slaughter returned as Undeliverable re #6 Notice of Option to Consent to US Magistrate Judge. (Dkt. 6 regenerated)**2 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869)(SP)
October 25, 2021 Filing 11 Mail addressed to Ossie Lee Slaughter returned as Undeliverable re #5 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869)(SP)
October 25, 2021 Filing 10 Mail addressed to Ossie Lee Slaughter returned as Undeliverable re #4 Order Granting Petitioner's #1 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Dkt. 4 regenerated)**2 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869)(SP)
October 25, 2021 Filing 9 Mail addressed to Ossie Lee Slaughter returned as Undeliverable re #2 Letter to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (Dkt. 2 regenerated) **2 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869)(SP)
October 25, 2021 Filing 8 Mail addressed to Ossie Lee Slaughter returned as Undeliverable re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Per staff at WCC, inmate transferred to MCC-WSR-MSU. Docket updated. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869)(SP)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR SERVICE AND ANSWER, 28 U.C.S. 2254 PETITION by E-Mail upon the Respondent and upon the Attorney General of the State of Washington, signed by Judge Theresa L Fricke. ( #5 Petition and this Order and Notice of Option to Consent emailed 10/22/2021) (Attachments: #1 Pro Se Instruction Sheet) **4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869) (AMD)
October 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF OPTION TO CONSENT TO US MAGISTRATE JUDGE. To consent to a US Magistrate Judge, return the executed form by 11/22/2021. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869) (AMD)
October 20, 2021 Filing 5 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Ossie Lee Slaughter. (IFP Granted) **114 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869)(SP)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S #1 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; signed by Judge Theresa L Fricke. The Clerk is directed to file petitioner's petition for writ of habeas corpus without the prepayment of fees. (cc: DOC) **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869)(SP)
October 19, 2021 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869)(AMD)
October 18, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Ossie Lee Slaughter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Petition for Writ Of Habeas Corpus)**117 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869) (AMD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slaughter v. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ossie Lee Slaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Daniel White
Represented By: Keith A Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?