Bennett et al v. Homesite Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Robert Bennett and Meg Bennett
Defendant: Homesite Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv01422
Filed: October 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying Defendant's #10 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER. The Court has received and reviewed Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority. (Dkt. No. #17 .) Local Rule 7(n) permits the filing of a notice of supplemental authority before the Court rules on a motion provided that the notice identifies "relevant authority issued after the date the party's last brief was filed." Plaintiffs' Notice refers to a California decision from 1970 and 2012 decision from this District. This violates Local Rule 7(n). The Court hereby STRIKES the Notice, and will not consider its contents. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiffs Meg Bennett, Robert Bennett re #10 MOTION to Stay Notice of Supplemental Authority (Hanson, Joel)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DECLARATION of Tyler Berry filed by Defendant Homesite Insurance Company re #10 MOTION to Stay (Lindquist, Gabrielle)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DECLARATION of Eliot M. Harris filed by Defendant Homesite Insurance Company re #10 MOTION to Stay (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lindquist, Gabrielle)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPLY, filed by Defendant Homesite Insurance Company, TO RESPONSE to #10 MOTION to Stay (Lindquist, Gabrielle)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Meg Bennett, Robert Bennett, to #10 MOTION to Stay . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Joel Hanson)(Hanson, Joel)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Eliot M Harris for Defendant Homesite Insurance Company from 12/27/21 - 12/31/21, 1/26/22 - 1/28/22, 2/21/22 - 2/25/22. (Harris, Eliot)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DECLARATION of Eliot M. Harris filed by Defendant Homesite Insurance Company re #10 MOTION to Stay (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Lindquist, Gabrielle)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Stay , filed by Defendant Homesite Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/10/2021, (Lindquist, Gabrielle)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Defendant's ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #7 Notice of Removal, by Homesite Insurance Company. (Lindquist, Gabrielle) Modified on 11/23/2021 to link entry to Amended Complaint (SB).
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 1/4/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/21/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/28/2021. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (GC)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF ADDITIONAL PLEADINGS FROM UNDERLYING STATE COURT ACTION, PER LCR 101(b) AND 28 U.S.C. 1446(a) ; filed by Defendant Homesite Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint)(Lindquist, Gabrielle)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal, by Homesite Insurance Company.(Harris, Eliot)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiffs Meg Bennett, Robert Bennett (Hanson, Joel)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment.JURY DEMAND - NOT submitted properly or NOT on file (Please refer to #LCR 101(b)(3) to file a proper jury demand) (RE)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement; Added Corporate parents/ affiliates. (RE)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (RE)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate parent /affiliate Homesite Insurance Company is 100% owned by Homesite Securities Company LLC, which is 100% owned by Homesite Group Incorporated, which is 100% owned by AMFAM, Inc., which is 100% owned by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I., which is 100% owned by AmFam Holdings, Inc., which is 100% owned by American Family Insurance Mutual Holding Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Homesite Insurance Company (Harris, Eliot) Modified on 10/19/2021 to add affiliates. (RE)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendant Homesite Insurance Company. (Lindquist, Gabrielle) (Main Document 2 replaced on 10/18/2021 to flatten malformed PDF) (KB).
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 21-2-11561-2-KNT; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7296021) Attorney Gabrielle Lindquist added to party Homesite Insurance Company(pty:dft), filed by Homesite Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Lindquist, Gabrielle) Modified on 10/19/2021 to edit document title. (RE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennett et al v. Homesite Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bennett
Represented By: Joel B Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meg Bennett
Represented By: Joel B Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homesite Insurance Company
Represented By: Gabrielle Lindquist
Represented By: Eliot M Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?