O'Duffy v. Magic Leap Inc
Plaintiff: Jonathan O'Duffy
Defendant: Magic Leap, Inc. and Magic Leap Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv01433
Filed: October 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2021 Filing 22 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Jonathan O'Duffy (Golshan, Caroline)
December 1, 2021 Filing 21 REPLY, filed by Defendant Magic Leap Inc, TO RESPONSE to #16 Amended MOTION to Dismiss (Saack, Amy)
November 30, 2021 Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: 7 days. Bench Trial is set for 3/6/2023 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 15106 before Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Joinder of Parties due by 12/28/2021, Amended Pleadings due by 9/7/2022, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 9/7/2022, Discovery completed by 11/6/2022, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 11/20/2022, Dispositive motions due by 12/6/2022, Motions in Limine due by 2/6/2023, Pretrial Order due by 2/22/2023, Trial briefs and trial exhibits to be submitted by 3/1/2023 (KERR)
November 29, 2021 Filing 19 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Jonathan O'Duffy, to #16 Amended MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Motion to Dismiss)(Golshan, Caroline)
November 29, 2021 Filing 18 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 7. (Golshan, Caroline)
November 23, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER re Dkt. #17 : Per LCR 5(d), Rule 26 initial disclosures and discovery requests and responses must not be filed unless they are used in the proceedings or the court orders filing. (LH)
November 22, 2021 Filing 17 INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Defendant Magic Leap Inc.(Saack, Amy)
November 10, 2021 Filing 16 Amended MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant Magic Leap Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/3/2021, (Saack, Amy)
November 10, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Caroline Golshan on behalf of Plaintiff Jonathan O'Duffy. (Golshan, Caroline)
November 10, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant Magic Leap Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/3/2021, (Saack, Amy)
November 3, 2021 Filing 13 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant Magic Leap Inc (Saack, Amy)
November 1, 2021 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Magic Leap Inc (Saack, Amy)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 11/29/2021, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER EXTENDING TIME re Parties' #8 Stipulated MOTION. Although the motion was not signed by an attorney who has appeared in the case, the response deadline is hereby extended to 11/10/2021. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
October 27, 2021 NOTE: Document #8 was filed incorrectly/improperly. Appearance of attorney Caroline Golshan is not proper, and notices of electronic filing will not be sent until corrected. Counsel must submit a Petition for Admission and register for ECF Filing access. After you have been admitted to practice before this court, please promptly file a Notice of Appearance in this case pursuant to LCR 83.1(d)(1). Questions about this process should be directed to the Attorney Admission Clerk at (206) 370-8862 or WAWD_Admissions@wawd.uscourts.gov. (LH) (cc: Attorney Golshan via ECF ad hoc)
October 26, 2021 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Amy L. Saack filed by Defendant Magic Leap Inc re #8 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time (Saack, Amy)
October 26, 2021 Filing 8 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time, filed by Defendant Magic Leap Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/26/2021, (Saack, Amy)
October 26, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Amy Saack on behalf of Defendant Magic Leap Inc. (Saack, Amy)
October 26, 2021 Attorney John Edward Moore added for Magic Leap Inc per #7 Notice of Appearance. (LH)
October 26, 2021 SECOND NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The #6 Notice of Appearance has not been signed by William A Davis and John E Moore. As such, neither attorney was added to the case and neither will receive future notices until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. Please file corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing. (LH) (cc: Attorneys Davis and Moore via ECF ad hoc)
October 25, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Amy Saack on behalf of Defendant Magic Leap Inc. (Saack, Amy)
October 25, 2021 NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The #5 Notice of Appearance was improperly signed by William A Davis and John E Moore. As such, attorneys Davis and Moore were not added to the case and will not receive future notices until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. Please file corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing. (LH) (cc: Attorneys Davis and Moore via ECF ad hoc)
October 25, 2021 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Magic Leap Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/1/2021. (MET)
October 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Amy Saack on behalf of Defendant Magic Leap Inc. (Saack, Amy)
October 21, 2021 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment.JURY DEMAND - NOT submitted properly or NOT on file (Please refer to #LCR 101(b)(3) to file a proper jury demand) (RE)
October 21, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s), Attorney Admission.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (RE)
October 21, 2021 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (RE)
October 20, 2021 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Amy L. Saack by Defendant Magic Leap, Inc. (Saack, Amy)
October 20, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 21-2-12870-6 SEA; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7299666) Attorney Amy Saack added to party Magic Leap, Inc.(pty:dft), filed by Magic Leap, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Saack, Amy) (Attachment 1 replaced to flatten malformed PDF on 10/20/2021) (STP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Duffy v. Magic Leap Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan O'Duffy
Represented By: Patrick C Cook
Represented By: Caroline Golshan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magic Leap, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Saack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magic Leap Inc
Represented By: Amy Saack
Represented By: John Edward Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?