Lemmerman v. Airgas USA LLC et al
Plaintiff: Beau Lemmerman
Defendant: Airgas USA LLC, Taylor-Wharton America Inc and TMG Gases, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01458
Filed: October 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 24, 2021 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Plaintiff against defendant(s) TMG Gases, Inc. with JURY DEMAND, filed by Beau Lemmerman. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Thal, Spencer)
December 23, 2021 Filing 18 PRAECIPE to correct Dkt. 15-2 by Plaintiff Beau Lemmerman (Attachments: #1 Corrected Proposed Order Granting Leave to File First Amended Complaint)(Thal, Spencer)
December 23, 2021 Filing 17 PRAECIPE to Correct Dkt. 15 by Plaintiff Beau Lemmerman (Attachments: #1 Corrected Stipulated Motion For Leave to Amend Complaint)(Thal, Spencer)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER (text only) granting #15 Stipulated MOTION to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff is granted leave to file his First Amended Complaint adding TMG Gases, Inc., as a defendant and making certain other edits and clarifications. This right to amend is granted to Plaintiff without prejudice or limit to any answers or affirmative defenses that have been or may be asserted by Defendant in response. Counsel is directed to e-file the Amended Complaint in the form attached to the parties' stipulated motion. Authorized by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
December 21, 2021 Filing 15 Stipulated MOTION to Amend Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Beau Lemmerman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/21/2021, (Thal, Spencer)
November 17, 2021 Reset Deadline: The parties' #14 Stipulated MOTION to Extend JSR Deadline is GRANTED. Joint Status Report due by 2/28/2022. (VE)
November 15, 2021 Filing 14 Stipulated MOTION to Extend JSR Deadline, filed by Plaintiff Beau Lemmerman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Extend JSR Deadline)(Thal, Zachariah)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. Pursuant to the #12 STIPULATION of the parties and FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), it is ordered that all claims, defenses, and counterclaims by and between Plaintiff and Defendant Taylor-Wharton are dismissed without prejudice, and without an award of fees, costs, or expenses to either party. This Order does not affect the remaining claims Plaintiff Lemmerman has against any other defendant. (VE)
November 15, 2021 Filing 12 Stipulated MOTION and Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice, filed by Defendant Taylor-Wharton America Inc. Noting Date 11/15/2021, (Hanson, Eric)
November 3, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal, with JURY DEMAND by Airgas USA LLC.(Erfle, Nancy)
November 2, 2021 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Taylor-Wharton America Inc (Hanson, Eric)
November 2, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint; by Taylor-Wharton America Inc.(Hanson, Eric)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/15/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/22/2021, Joint Status Report due by 11/29/2021, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
October 29, 2021 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant(s) Taylor-Wharton America Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/5/2021. (RE)
October 28, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Eric Charles Hanson on behalf of Defendant Taylor-Wharton America Inc. (Hanson, Eric)
October 28, 2021 Filing 6 LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. JURY DEMAND - properly submitted state court jury demand on file (RE)
October 28, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Pro Hac Vice Admission.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (notice sent via email (ad hoc) (RE)
October 28, 2021 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
October 28, 2021 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (RE)
October 27, 2021 Filing 3 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Beau Lemmerman (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service to Defendant's Counsel)(Thal, Zachariah)
October 27, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Airgas, Inc, Corporate Parent L'Air Liquide S.A. for Airgas USA LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Airgas USA LLC (Erfle, Nancy)
October 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 21-2-12998-2 SEA; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7309244) Attorney Nancy M Erfle added to party Airgas USA LLC(pty:dft), filed by Airgas USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Proof of Service, #4 Exhibit Consent to Removal by Co-Defendant)(Erfle, Nancy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lemmerman v. Airgas USA LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beau Lemmerman
Represented By: Spencer Nathan Thal
Represented By: Zachariah Nathan William Thal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airgas USA LLC
Represented By: Nancy M Erfle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor-Wharton America Inc
Represented By: Eric Charles Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TMG Gases, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?