Dahlstrom v. Life Care Centers of America Inc et al
Plaintiff: Raju A.T. Dahlstrom and Raju AT Dahlstrom
Defendant: Thomas & Company, Life Care Centers of America Inc., Mt. Vernon Operations LLC a foreign limited liability company doing business as Life Care Center of Mount Vernon, Todd Weldon Fletcher, Kelley Falcon, Nancy E. Butner, Tara Lyn Travers, Jennifer Kay Scott, Glenda E. Mendoza Mendez, Thomas and Thorngren, Inc., Makayla Peery, Washington State Department of Social and Health Services, Donald L Clintsman, Cheryl Strange, Aging and Long-Term Support Administration, William Moss, Adult Protective Services, Amy Finch, James Riccardi, Division of Residential Care Services, Michelle R. Reynolds, Cynthia M. Southerly, Developmental Disabilities Administration, Deborah Roberts, Tia Yvette Mathews, Northwest Regional Council, Board of Governors, Daniel Murphy, Peter Anthony Acosta, Sunrise Care Services, Inc., Sue Ann Closser, Janelle Marie Saville, Margaret Pattok, Sharon Anderson, Skagit County, Whatcom County, Does 1-20, Life Care Centers of America Inc, Mt Vernon Operations LLC a foreign limited liability company doing business as Life Care Center of Mount Vernon also known as MVO also known as LCCMV, Sunrise Care Services Inc, LCCA, MVO, LCCMV, Nancy E Butner, Glenda E Mendoza Mendez, Thomas and Thorngren Inc, DSHS, ALTSA, Bill Moss, APS, Jim Riccardi, RCS, Michelle R Reynolds, Cynthia M Southerly, DDA, NWRC, BOG, Dan Murphy, SCS, Peggy Pattok, SC and WC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01465
Filed: October 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Tana Lin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2021 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re Dkt #28 : Terminated motion and revised filing name as NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, per the direction of chambers. (LH)
December 20, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Emily Grace Starr Guildner on behalf of Defendant Sunrise Care Services Inc. (Guildner, Emily)
December 17, 2021 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re Dkt #29 : Edited docket title to Reply to Response to #14 Motion to Remand. (LH)
December 16, 2021 Filing 29 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Raju AT Dahlstrom, to RESPONSE #14 MOTION Remand. to #13 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Defendant Skagit County, #15 MOTION , #16 MOTION for More Definite Statement , #28 MOTION to Dismiss Party , #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , , #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(B)(6). Oral Argument Requested. (Dahlstrom, Raju) Modified to revise title of filing on 12/17/2021 (LH).
December 16, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal MOTION to Dismiss Party , filed by Plaintiff Raju AT Dahlstrom. (Dahlstrom, Raju) Modified to terminate motion and change filing to Notice on 12/23/2021 (LH).
December 16, 2021 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #27 Petition: Edited docket text to create linkage. (LH)
December 15, 2021 Filing 27 PETITION Objection to Improper Filing of #1 Notice of Removal and #26 Response, filed by Raju AT Dahlstrom.(Dahlstrom, Raju) Modified to create linkage on 12/16/2021 (LH).
December 14, 2021 Filing 26 RESPONSE, by Defendant Skagit County, to #14 MOTION Remand . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pedersen, Erik)
December 14, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Joinder to Response by Def Mt Vernon Operations LLC Opposition to Pltf Motion to Remand re #14 MOTION Remand , #24 Response to Motion ; filed by Defendants Peter Anthony Acosta, Daniel Murphy, Northwest Regional Council. (Larson, Nicholas)
December 13, 2021 Filing 24 RESPONSE, by Defendant Mt Vernon Operations LLC, to #14 MOTION Remand . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Remand)(Belzberg, Adam)
December 13, 2021 Case Reassigned to Judge Tana Lin. U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour no longer assigned to the case. (GT)
December 6, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney George C Roche on behalf of Defendant Whatcom County. (Roche, George)
December 6, 2021 Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER re Defendants' #19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Court orders that the briefing is stayed on the most recent defense motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. #19 ) pending resolution of Plaintiff's motion to remand (Dkt. No. #14 .) This stay of briefing will apply to any further motions that are filed unless the Court orders otherwise. The Court will issue new noting dates for all pending defense motions (Dkt. Nos. #11 , #13 , #16 , #19 ) if doing so is appropriate based on the outcome of Plaintiff's motion to remand. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SR)
December 3, 2021 Filing 21 REQUEST by Defendants Peter Anthony Acosta, Daniel Murphy, Northwest Regional Council for Judicial Notice re #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #20 Declaration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A)(Larson, Nicholas)
December 3, 2021 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Nicholas C. Larson filed by Defendants Peter Anthony Acosta, Daniel Murphy, Northwest Regional Council re #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Larson, Nicholas)
December 3, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants Peter Anthony Acosta, Daniel Murphy, Northwest Regional Council. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/31/2021, (Larson, Nicholas)
November 30, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Scott Alan Marlow on behalf of Defendants Adult Protective Services, Aging and Long-Term Support Administration, Donald L Clintsman, Developmental Disabilities Administration, Division of Residential Care Services, Amy Finch, Tia Yvette Mathews, William Moss, Michelle R Reynolds, James Riccardi, Deborah Roberts, Cynthia M Southerly, Cheryl Strange, Washington State Department of Social and Health Services. (Marlow, Scott)
November 30, 2021 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that briefing on MVO's motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. #11 ), Skagit County's motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. #13 ), and other Defendants' motion for a more definite statement (Dkt. No. #16 ) is hereby STAYED pending the Court's decision on Plaintiff's motion to remand to state court (Dkt. No. #14 ). The Court will issue new noting dates for the other three defense motions if doing so is appropriate based on the outcome of Plaintiff's motion to remand. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SR)
November 30, 2021 NOTE: Document #16 was filed incorrectly/improperly. Appearance of attorney Scott A. Marlow on behalf of Adult Protective Services, Aging and Long-Term Support Administration, Developmental Disabilities Administration, and Division of Residential Care Services is not proper, and notices of electronic filing will not be sent until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. (SR)
November 29, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for More Definite Statement , filed by Defendants Adult Protective Services, Aging and Long-Term Support Administration, Donald L Clintsman, Developmental Disabilities Administration, Division of Residential Care Services, Amy Finch, Tia Yvette Mathews, William Moss, Michelle R Reynolds, James Riccardi, Deborah Roberts, Cynthia M Southerly, Cheryl Strange, Washington State Department of Social and Health Services. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/10/2021, (Marlow, Scott)
November 29, 2021 ***Motion terminated: #15 MOTION filed by Raju AT Dahlstrom has been terminated. Document as filed is a Demand for Jury Trial and the event type has been changed. (SR)
November 28, 2021 Filing 15 JURY DEMAND MOTION , filed by Plaintiff Raju AT Dahlstrom. (Dahlstrom, Raju) Modified on 11/29/2021 to edit document title (SR).
November 28, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION Remand , filed by Plaintiff Raju AT Dahlstrom. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) Noting Date 12/17/2021, (Dahlstrom, Raju)
November 24, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Defendant Skagit County, filed by Defendant Skagit County. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/17/2021, (Pedersen, Erik)
November 23, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance (Dahlstrom, Raju)
November 17, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(B)(6), filed by Defendant Mt Vernon Operations LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/10/2021, (Belzberg, Adam)
November 10, 2021 Filing 10 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant Mt Vernon Operations LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Morgan, Mark)
November 8, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE: Plaintiff Raju AT Dahlstrom has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (STP)
November 1, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Mt Vernon Operations LLC (Morgan, Mark)
November 1, 2021 ***Deadlines/Hearings terminated. Terminated Corporate Disclosure Statement deadlines for defendants who have not yet appeared: Life Care Centers of America Inc, Sunrise Care Services Inc, and Thomas & Company.(KB)
November 1, 2021 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re Corporate Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines: Modified on 11/1/2021 to strike parties who have not appeared (defendants Life Care Centers of America Inc, Thomas & Company, and Sunrise Care Services Inc) and to add the name of Northwest Regional Council. If applicable, defendant Northwest Regional Council must file a corporate disclosure statement by 11/01/2021. (KB)
October 29, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE ENTRY SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT DATES All counsel and any pro se parties are directed to meet and confer and to provide the Court with a combined Joint Status Report (the Report) by the deadline set below. This meet-and-confer must be a face-to-face meeting or a telephonic conference. If the parties are unable to agree on any part of the Report, they may answer in separate paragraphs; no separate reports are to be filed. The Report must contain the following information: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; and 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation.The deadlines below may be extended only by court order. Any request for extension of these deadlines should be made by email to Courtroom Deputy Clerk Gabriel Traber at gabriel_traber@wawd.uscourts.gov. The parties who have appeared in this matter must meet and confer before contacting the Court to request an extension. If this case involves claims that are exempt from the requirements of FRCP 26(a) and 26(f), please notify the Courtroom Deputy Clerk. Please note: Initial Disclosures are not to be filed. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/28/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/4/2022, Joint Status Report due by 2/11/2022. Cc to plaintiff via US Mail. (GT)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (Cc to plaintiff via US Mail)(GT)
October 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Adam S. Belzberg on behalf of Defendant Mt. Vernon Operations LLC. (Belzberg, Adam)
October 28, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s).See attached letter for more information and instructions. (ST)
October 28, 2021 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from Skagit County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (cc: plaintiff via USPS) JURY DEMAND - NOT submitted properly or NOT on file (Please refer to #LCR 101(b)(3) to file a proper jury demand) (ST)
October 28, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE Amended Notice of Removal of Civil Action re #1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendant Mt. Vernon Operations LLC. (Morgan, Mark)
October 28, 2021 U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (ST)
October 28, 2021 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant(s) Life Care Centers of America, Inc., Mt. Vernon Operations LLC, Northwest Regional Council (if applicable) Thomas & Company and Sunrise Care Services, Inc., must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/4/2021. (ST) Modified on 11/1/2021 to strike parties who have not appeared and add defendant Northwest Regional Council (KB).
October 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Skagit County Superior Court, case number 21-2-00465-29; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7310083), filed by Mt. Vernon Operations LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint)(Morgan, Mark) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/12/2021: #3 NOA for Washington State Dept of Social and Health Services) (SR). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/12/2021: #4 NOA for Skagit County) (SR). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/12/2021: #5 NOA for Northwest Regional Council) (SR). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/12/2021: #6 NOA for Mt. Vernon Operations LLC Mark O. Morgan) (SR). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/12/2021: #7 NOA for Mt. Vernon Operations, LCC Adam S. Belzberg) (SR). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/12/2021: #8 Northwest Regional Council, Daniel Murphy and Peter A. Acosta) (SR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dahlstrom v. Life Care Centers of America Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Care Centers of America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mt. Vernon Operations LLC a foreign limited liability company doing business as Life Care Center of Mount Vernon
Represented By: Adam S. Belzberg
Represented By: Mark O Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Weldon Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelley Falcon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy E. Butner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara Lyn Travers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Kay Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenda E. Mendoza Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas and Thorngren, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Makayla Peery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State Department of Social and Health Services
Represented By: Scott Alan Marlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald L Clintsman
Represented By: Scott Alan Marlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Strange
Represented By: Scott Alan Marlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aging and Long-Term Support Administration
Represented By: Scott Alan Marlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Moss
Represented By: Scott Alan Marlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adult Protective Services
Represented By: Scott Alan Marlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Finch
Represented By: Scott Alan Marlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Riccardi
Represented By: Scott Alan Marlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Division of Residential Care Services
Represented By: Scott Alan Marlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle R. Reynolds
Represented By: Scott Alan Marlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia M. Southerly
Represented By: Scott Alan Marlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Developmental Disabilities Administration
Represented By: Scott Alan Marlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Roberts
Represented By: Scott Alan Marlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tia Yvette Mathews
Represented By: Scott Alan Marlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Regional Council
Represented By: Jacob M Downs
Represented By: Nicholas C Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Governors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Murphy
Represented By: Nicholas C Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Anthony Acosta
Represented By: Nicholas C Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunrise Care Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Ann Closser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janelle Marie Saville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Pattok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skagit County
Represented By: Erik Pedersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whatcom County
Represented By: George C Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Care Centers of America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mt Vernon Operations LLC a foreign limited liability company doing business as Life Care Center of Mount Vernon also known as MVO also known as LCCMV
Represented By: Mark O Morgan
Represented By: Adam S. Belzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunrise Care Services Inc
Represented By: Emily Grace Starr Guildner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LCCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MVO
Represented By: Mark O Morgan
Represented By: Adam S. Belzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LCCMV
Represented By: Mark O Morgan
Represented By: Adam S. Belzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy E Butner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenda E Mendoza Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas and Thorngren Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DSHS
Represented By: Scott Alan Marlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALTSA
Represented By: Scott Alan Marlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Moss
Represented By: Scott Alan Marlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APS
Represented By: Scott Alan Marlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Riccardi
Represented By: Scott Alan Marlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCS
Represented By: Scott Alan Marlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle R Reynolds
Represented By: Scott Alan Marlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia M Southerly
Represented By: Scott Alan Marlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DDA
Represented By: Scott Alan Marlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NWRC
Represented By: Jacob M Downs
Represented By: Nicholas C Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Murphy
Represented By: Nicholas C Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCS
Represented By: Emily Grace Starr Guildner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peggy Pattok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SC
Represented By: Erik Pedersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WC
Represented By: George C Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raju A.T. Dahlstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raju AT Dahlstrom
Represented By: Raju AT Dahlstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?