Hitchcock v. Bering Star LLC
Plaintiff: Gregory L Hitchcock
Defendant: Bering Star, LLC and Bering Star LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01475
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 817
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE ENTRY SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT DATES All counsel and any pro se parties are directed to meet and confer and to provide the Court with a combined Joint Status Report (the Report) by the deadline set below. This meet-and-confer must be a face-to-face meeting or a telephonic conference. If the parties are unable to agree on any part of the Report, they may answer in separate paragraphs; no separate reports are to be filed. The Report must contain the following information: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; and 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation.The deadlines below may be extended only by court order. Any request for extension of these deadlines should be made by email to Courtroom Deputy Clerk Gabriel Traber at gabriel_traber@wawd.uscourts.gov. The parties who have appeared in this matter must meet and confer before contacting the Court to request an extension. If this case involves claims that are exempt from the requirements of FRCP 26(a) and 26(f), please notify the Courtroom Deputy Clerk. Please note: Initial Disclosures are not to be filed. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 3/11/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/18/2022, Joint Status Report due by 3/25/2022. (GT)
December 1, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Bering Star LLC.(Jones, Jeremy)
November 5, 2021 Attorney Shantrice D Anderson added for Bering Star LLC; per #5 Notice of Appearance. (SR)
November 5, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeremy Jones on behalf of Defendant Bering Star LLC. (Jones, Jeremy)
November 5, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Bering Star, LLC on 11/3/2021, filed by Plaintiff Gregory L Hitchcock. (Williams, Douglas)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT)
November 1, 2021 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Bering Star LLC. (ST)
November 1, 2021 U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (ST)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR MARITIME PERSONAL INJURIES against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND Attorney Douglas Ralph Williams added to party Gregory L Hitchcock(pty:pla), filed by Gregory L Hitchcock. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Williams, Douglas) (Prepayment Waived)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hitchcock v. Bering Star LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory L Hitchcock
Represented By: Douglas Ralph Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bering Star, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bering Star LLC
Represented By: Jeremy Jones
Represented By: Shantrice D Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?