Kennedy et al v. Warren
Plaintiff: Robert F Kennedy, Jr, Joseph Mercola, Ronald Cummins and Chelsea Green Publishing Inc
Defendant: Elizabeth Warren
Case Number: 2:2021cv01508
Filed: November 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Referring Judge: S Kate Vaughan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting Defendant's #13 Motion for Relief from Deadline. Plaintiffs' #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is hereby renoted for 1/14/2022. Defendant's response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction must be filed no later than 1/10/2022. Plaintiffs' reply, if any, must be filed no later than 1/14/2022. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(MW)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant All Defendants Amended (Arnold, Nathan)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Chelsea Green Publishing Inc, Ronald Cummins, Robert F Kennedy, Jr, Joseph Mercola, to #13 MOTION for Relief From Opposition to Preliminary Injunction Deadline. (Arnold, Nathan)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 DECLARATION of Brian C. Kipnis filed by Defendant Elizabeth Warren re #25 MOTION for Joinder #13 MOTION for Relief From Opposition to Preliminary Injunction Deadline (Kipnis, Brian)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Joinder #13 MOTION for Relief From Opposition to Preliminary Injunction Deadline, filed by Defendant Elizabeth Warren. (Kipnis, Brian)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER: Defendant has filed a motion (Dkt. #13 ) to continue the deadline for her response to Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction (Dkt. #7 ). The Court hereby orders that, if Plaintiffs intend to oppose Defendant's motion, Plaintiffs must file their response no later than 12/16/2021, at 5:00 p.m. PST. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (MW)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brian C Kipnis on behalf of Defendant Elizabeth Warren. (Kipnis, Brian)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER: The Honorable James L. Robart recuses himself from this matter and the case is reassigned in rotation to the Honorable Barbara J. Rothstein. All future pleadings shall bear the cause number C21-1508BJR. Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Case reassigned to Judge James L. Robart for all further proceedings. Hon. S. Kate Vaughan no longer assigned to case. (KMP)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Lindsay J. McAleer on behalf of Defendant Elizabeth Warren. (McAleer, Lindsay)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #16 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Melinda K Johnson for Defendant Elizabeth Warren, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #15 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Elisabeth C. Frost for Defendant Elizabeth Warren, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Melinda K. Johnson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Elizabeth Warren (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7368833 (Stafford, William)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Elisabeth C. Frost FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Elizabeth Warren (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7368820 (Stafford, William)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DECLARATION of Nikko Mendoza filed by Defendant Elizabeth Warren re #13 MOTION for Relief From Opposition to Preliminary Injunction Deadline (Stafford, William)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Relief From Opposition to Preliminary Injunction Deadline, filed by Defendant Elizabeth Warren. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stafford, William)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by William B. Stafford on behalf of Defendant Elizabeth Warren. (Stafford, William)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Elizabeth Warren on 11/15/2021 (Arnold, Nathan)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiffs Chelsea Green Publishing Inc, Ronald Cummins, Robert F Kennedy, Jr, Joseph Mercola re #9 Declaration, #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #8 Declaration (Arnold, Nathan)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DECLARATION of Nathan J. Arnold filed by Plaintiffs Chelsea Green Publishing Inc, Ronald Cummins, Robert F Kennedy, Jr, Joseph Mercola re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Arnold, Nathan)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DECLARATION of Margo Baldwin filed by Plaintiffs Chelsea Green Publishing Inc, Ronald Cummins, Robert F Kennedy, Jr, Joseph Mercola re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Arnold, Nathan)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiffs Chelsea Green Publishing Inc, Ronald Cummins, Robert F Kennedy, Jr, Joseph Mercola. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/14/2022 12/31/2021, (Arnold, Nathan) Modified on 12/17/2021 (MW).
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by R. Bruce Johnston on behalf of Plaintiffs Chelsea Green Publishing Inc, Ronald Cummins, Robert F Kennedy, Jr, Joseph Mercola. (Johnston, R.)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Chelsea Green Publishing Inc (Arnold, Nathan)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Elizabeth Warren (KMP)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiffs Chelsea Green Publishing Inc, Ronald Cummins, Robert F Kennedy, Jr, Joseph Mercola (Arnold, Nathan)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s).See attached letter for more information and instructions. (ST)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Hon. S. Kate Vaughan added. (ST)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) Chelsea Green Publishing Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/15/2021. (ST)
November 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Plaintiffs with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7324165) Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party Chelsea Green Publishing, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party Ronald Cummins(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party Robert F. Kennedy, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan J Arnold added to party Joseph Mercola(pty:pla), filed by Robert F. Kennedy, Jr, Chelsea Green Publishing, Inc., Ronald Cummins, Joseph Mercola. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Arnold, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennedy et al v. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert F Kennedy, Jr
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Represented By: R. Bruce Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Mercola
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Represented By: R. Bruce Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Cummins
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Represented By: R. Bruce Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsea Green Publishing Inc
Represented By: Nathan J Arnold
Represented By: R. Bruce Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Warren
Represented By: Elisabeth C. Frost
Represented By: Melinda K Johnson
Represented By: Brian C Kipnis
Represented By: Lindsay J. McAleer
Represented By: William B. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?