Guenther v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Kathleen M Guenther
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2021cv01516
Filed: November 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David G Estudillo
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Benjamin J. Groebner on behalf of Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Groebner, Benjamin)
November 15, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on USAO-WDWA on 11/15/2021, filed by Plaintiff Kathleen M Guenther. (Oliver, David)
November 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:20-cv-00461-RSM, by Plaintiff Kathleen M Guenther. (Oliver, David)
November 12, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint. ***Action Required*** Notice of Related Cases Omitted.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Notice of Related Case must be filed by 11/17/2021. (ST)
November 10, 2021 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(ST)
November 10, 2021 Hon. David G. Estudillo added. (ST)
November 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security (Receipt # AWAWDC-7327203) Attorney David P Oliver added to party Kathleen M Guenther(pty:pla), filed by Kathleen M Guenther. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Oliver, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guenther v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen M Guenther
Represented By: David P Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Benjamin J. Groebner
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?