Boone v. Allaben et al
Plaintiff: Michael Boone
Defendant: John Allaben and Carolynne Allaben
Case Number: 2:2021cv01562
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge James L. Robart; Length of Trial: *4-5 days*. Jury Trial is set for 11/27/2023 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge James L. Robart. Joinder of Parties due by 1/27/2022, Amended Pleadings due by 5/31/2023, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 5/31/2023, Motions due by 6/30/2023, Discovery completed by 7/31/2023, Dispositive motions due by 8/29/2023, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 9/28/2023, Motions in Limine due by 10/16/2023, Pretrial Order due by 11/6/2023, Deposition Designations due by 11/8/2023, Pretrial Conference set for 11/13/2023 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge James L. Robart. Trial briefs to be submitted by 11/20/2023, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 11/20/2023. (AD)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal, with JURY DEMAND by John Allaben.(Nadler, Brian)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting Defendant's #11 Motion to Dismiss Party. The Court DISMISSES Mr. Boone's claims against Ms. Allaben without prejudice and with leave to amend. Mr. Boone shall file his amended complaint, if any, within 21 days of the filing date of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 4-5 days. (Nadler, Brian)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REPLY, filed by Defendants Carolynne Allaben, John Allaben, TO RESPONSE to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Party Carolynne Allaben (Nadler, Brian)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Michael Boone, to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Party Carolynne Allaben. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rothschild, John)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel John Rothschild for Plaintiff Michael Boone from January 26-February 14. (Rothschild, John)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel John Rothschild for Plaintiff Michael Boone from December 22 - January 3. (Rothschild, John)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DECLARATION of John Allaben filed by Defendant John Allaben re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Party Carolynne Allaben (Nadler, Brian)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DECLARATION of Carolynne Allaben filed by Defendant Carolynne Allaben re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Party Carolynne Allaben (Nadler, Brian)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Party Carolynne Allaben, filed by Defendant Carolynne Allaben. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/24/2021, (Nadler, Brian)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 1/6/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/16/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/30/2021. (AD)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Sara B Amies on behalf of Plaintiff Michael Boone. (Amies, Sara)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT/ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by James Fick, on behalf of Carolynne Allaben, on 11/22/2021. (Rothschild, John)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on John Allaben on 11/18/2021, filed by Plaintiff Michael Boone. (Rothschild, John)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Defendants Carolynne Allaben, John Allaben. (Nadler, Brian)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal,. ***Action Required*** Civil Cover Sheet Omitted.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (MET)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. JURY DEMAND - properly submitted state court jury demand on file. (Ad Hoc P/C John Rothschild as email address the court has on file differs from the one on the pleadings) (ST)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendants Carolynne Allaben, John Allaben (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appearance, #2 Notice to Superior Court Clerk of Removal, #3 Certificate of E-Service)(Nadler, Brian)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendants Carolynne Allaben, John Allaben (Nadler, Brian)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge James L. Robart added. (Ad Hoc P/C John Rothschild as email address the court has on file differs from the one on the pleadings) (ST)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 21-2-15129-5; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7339173) Attorney James George Fick added to party Carolynne Allaben(pty:dft), Attorney James George Fick added to party John Allaben(pty:dft), filed by Carolynne Allaben, John Allaben. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(Fick, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/19/2021: #2 Complaint) (ST) Modified on 11/19/2021. Description of Attachment# 1 updated. (ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boone v. Allaben et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Boone
Represented By: John Rothschild
Represented By: Sara B Amies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Allaben
Represented By: Brian C Nadler
Represented By: Colleen A. Lovejoy
Represented By: James George Fick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolynne Allaben
Represented By: Brian C Nadler
Represented By: Colleen A. Lovejoy
Represented By: James George Fick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?