Schwarz v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Amy Elizabeth Schwarz
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2021cv01570
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Fricke
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to USAO WD-WA on 12/9/2021, filed by Plaintiff Amy Elizabeth Schwarz. (Attachments: #1 Electronic Signatures)(Kerr, Kevin)
December 16, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Heidi Triesch on behalf of Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Triesch, Heidi)
November 23, 2021 Filing 6 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(GMR)
November 23, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against defendant Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Amy Elizabeth Schwarz. (GMR)
November 23, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Service of corrected image is attached). (GMR)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis signed by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (GMR) (Main Document 3 replaced on 11/23/2021) (GMR).
November 22, 2021 Filing 2 CONSENT by Plaintiff to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. (GMR)
November 22, 2021 Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (CDA)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Amy Elizabeth Schwarz. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons USAG, #4 Summons OGC, #5 Summons USAO)(Kerr, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schwarz v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Elizabeth Schwarz
Represented By: Kevin Kerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Heidi Triesch
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?