Fields v. Halvorson et al
Plaintiff: Zachary Fields
Defendant: Kurt R Halvorson and Double D
Case Number: 2:2021cv01591
Filed: November 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint; by Double D, Kurt R Halvorson.(Chavez, Eric)
January 12, 2022 Filing 11 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 4. Filed by Defendants Double D, Kurt R Halvorson.(Chavez, Eric)
January 5, 2022 Filing 10 INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Plaintiff Zachary Fields.(Gooding, James)
January 5, 2022 Filing 9 INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Defendants Double D, Kurt R Halvorson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Chavez, Eric)
December 22, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand , filed by Plaintiff Zachary Fields. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion, #2 Exhibit 1) Noting Date 1/28/2022, (Gooding, James)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 1/12/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/29/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/5/2022. (LC)
November 30, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kimberly A West on behalf of Defendants Double D, Kurt R Halvorson. (West, Kimberly)
November 30, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s).See attached letter for more information and instructions. (Ad Hoc: Kimberly A West) (ST)
November 30, 2021 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from Snohomish County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. JURY DEMAND - properly submitted state court jury demand on file (ST)
November 30, 2021 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (ST)
November 24, 2021 Filing 3 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS RE: Notice of Removal Declaration of Eric S. Chavez by Defendants Double D, Kurt R Halvorson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Chavez, Eric)
November 24, 2021 Filing 2 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendants Double D, Kurt R Halvorson (Chavez, Eric)
November 24, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Snohomish, case number 21-2-05094-31; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7346513) Attorney Eric S Chavez added to party Double D(pty:dft), Attorney Eric S Chavez added to party Kurt R Halvorson(pty:dft), filed by Double D, Kurt R Halvorson. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chavez, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fields v. Halvorson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Fields
Represented By: James F Gooding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt R Halvorson
Represented By: Eric S Chavez
Represented By: Kimberly A West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Double D
Represented By: Eric S Chavez
Represented By: Kimberly A West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?