Prodigy Finance CM2017-1 DAC v. Martins
Plaintiff: Prodigy Finance CM2017-1 DAC
Defendant: Penha Cristina Braga Martins
Case Number: 2:2021cv01601
Filed: November 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 0009
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2022 Filing 12 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Penha Cristina Braga Martins (GT)
January 13, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Default against Penha Cristina Braga Martins,, filed by Plaintiff Prodigy Finance CM2017-1 DAC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Entry of Default, #2 Supplement Declaration In Support) Noting Date 1/13/2022, (Yumo, Noel)
December 22, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Penha Cristina Braga Martins on 12/21/2021, filed by Plaintiff Prodigy Finance CM2017-1 DAC. (Yumo, Noel)
December 14, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Noel S Yumo. Filed by Plaintiff Prodigy Finance CM2017-1 DAC. (Yumo, Noel)
December 6, 2021 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Plaintiff Prodigy Finance CM2017-1 DAC. (Yumo, Noel)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT)
December 1, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Petition (Other). ***Action Required*** Civil Cover Sheet Omitted.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (ST)
December 1, 2021 Filing 5 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Penha Cristina Braga Martins. (ST)
December 1, 2021 U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (ST)
November 30, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Prodigy Finance CM2017-1 DAC (Yumo, Noel)
November 30, 2021 Filing 3 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Petition (Other) by Plaintiff Prodigy Finance CM2017-1 DAC (Yumo, Noel)
November 30, 2021 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Nicole de Rauville In Support of Petition re #1 Petition (Other) by Plaintiff Prodigy Finance CM2017-1 DAC (Yumo, Noel) (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/1/2021) (ST). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/1/2021: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11) (ST). Modified on 12/1/2021. Declaration separated from exhibits. Exhibits posted as attachments by clerk. (ST)
November 30, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION TO CONFIRM FOREIGN ARBITRAL AWARD (Receipt # AWAWDC-7350150), filed by Prodigy Finance CM2017-1 DAC.(Yumo, Noel) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/2/2021 due to internal system error) (ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prodigy Finance CM2017-1 DAC v. Martins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prodigy Finance CM2017-1 DAC
Represented By: Noel S Yumo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penha Cristina Braga Martins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?