In re: Maria Enriqueta Romero
In Re: Maria Enriqueta Romero
Case Number: 2:2021rd00067
Filed: September 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Reciprocal Discipline suspending Maria Enriqueta Romero from the practice of law before this Court by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Order e-mailed to Clerk of US District Court, EDWA, Clerk of US Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Clerk of US Bankruptcy Court, WDWA and WSBA. Changed admission status in ECF to suspended. Mailed Order to addresson docket. (DS)
October 18, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated. (DS)
September 20, 2021 Filing 3 Mail addressed to Maria Romero at Zarco Law PLLC, 8201 164th Ave NE STE 200, Redmond, WA 98052 returned as Undeliverable re #2 Order to Show Cause. (DS)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Show Cause Response due by 10/7/2021. Mailed Order to addresses on docket. (DS)
September 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Suspension from the Supreme Court of Washington, Order No. 202,016-0, suspending Mari Enriqueta aka Queta Romero for a period of 30 days, with Notice of Suspension from WSBA Proceeding No. 20#00050. (DS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Maria Enriqueta Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Maria Enriqueta Romero
Represented By: Maria Enriqueta Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?