Aguda v. Ohara et al
Plaintiff: Alih P Aguda
Defendant: Unknown Organization, Mike Ohara, Christian M, Shannon Geller, Store Manager, Verizon Store Manager, Verizon Wireless, Wireless Advocates LLC and Costco Wholesale
Case Number: 2:2022cv00010
Filed: January 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Lauren King
Referring Judge: Tana Lin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2022 Filing 15 Mail addressed to Alih P Aguda returned as Undeliverable re #2 Letter. (document resent to current address: PO Box 50231 Bellevue WA 98015) (MW)
February 7, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE/New Resident Addendum; filed by Plaintiff Alih P Aguda. (LH)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Denying Emergency Motion and Dismissing Case: The Plaintiff's amended emergency summon request, Dkt. No. #12 , is DENIED, and the case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Tana Lin. (LH) (cc: Plaintiff via US mail)
February 1, 2022 Filing 12 Addendum/Amended MOTION Emergency Summon Request by Plaintiff Alih P Aguda (LH) Modified to turn into motion on 2/3/2022 (LH).
January 31, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION/Emergency Summon Request, filed by Plaintiff Alih P Aguda. Noted by Clerk for 1/31/2022 (LH)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE authorized by Judge Lauren King. Case reassigned to Judge Tana Lin for all further proceedings. Judge Lauren King no longer assigned to case. (cc: Pro Se Plaintiff via USPS) (NAW)
January 28, 2022 Filing 9 Addendum re #8 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Alih P Aguda (MW)
January 27, 2022 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Costco Wholesale, Shannon Geller, Christian M, Mike Ohara, Store Manager, Verizon Store Manager, Verizon Wireless, Wireless Advocates LLC, filed by Alih P Aguda. (Attachments: #1 Addendum)(MW)
January 18, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name Filed by Plaintiff Alih P Aguda. Corrected PO Box number. (MW)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #5 Request. Plaintiff shall, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, file an amended complaint. If an acceptable amended complaint is not filed within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, this action will be dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this Order to plaintiff and to place this Order to Show Cause on the Court's calendar for 2/25/2022. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (SR)(cc: Plaintiff via U.S. mail)
January 7, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST for a Court Date filed by Plaintiff Alih P Aguda. Noted by clerk for 1/28/2022. (SB)
January 6, 2022 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Unknown Organization (Receipt # IFP Granted), filed by Alih P Aguda.(TF)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis signed by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. (TF)cc: Pro Se Aguda
January 6, 2022 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (JWC)
January 5, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Alih P Aguda. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) Case assignment letter given to Plaintiff at window (JWC) Modified on 1/5/2022 to indicate case assignment letter has already been provided (JWC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aguda v. Ohara et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alih P Aguda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Organization
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Ohara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian M
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Geller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Store Manager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Store Manager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Wireless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wireless Advocates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?