DDSSBOS LLC v. The Boeing Company
Plaintiff: DDSSBOS LLC d/b/a Dav El/Boston Coach and DDSSBOS LLC a Massachusetts limited liability company doing business as Dav El/Boston Coach
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Case Number: 2:2022cv00249
Filed: March 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting Parties' #11 Stipulated MOTION. The deadline for Boeing to move, plead, or otherwise respond to Dav El's Complaint is extended by an additional 30 days to 5/11/2022. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Move, Plead, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by 30 Days and Extending Early Case Deadlines, filed by Defendant The Boeing Company. Noting Date 4/7/2022, (Perez, David)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff DDSSBOS LLC (Martirosian, Claire)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by DDSSBOS LLC (Martirosian, Claire)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3/15/2022. (JWC)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re Parties' #7 Stipulated MOTION Extending Time to Move, Plead, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. The deadline for Boeing to move, plead, or otherwise respond to Dav El's Complaint is extended by 32 days to 4/11/2022. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Move, Plead, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by 32 Days and Extending Early Case Deadlines, filed by Defendant The Boeing Company. Noting Date 3/4/2022, (Perez, David)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (JWC)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (JWC)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DECLARATION of David A. Perez re Filing Notice of Removal with State Court Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant The Boeing Company (Perez, David)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant The Boeing Company (Attachments: #1 State Court Records)(Perez, David)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by The Boeing Company (Perez, David)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DECLARATION of David A. Perez re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant The Boeing Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3)(Perez, David)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 22-2-01845-3; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7460003) Attorney David A. Perez added to party The Boeing Company(pty:dft), filed by The Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint)(Perez, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DDSSBOS LLC v. The Boeing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DDSSBOS LLC d/b/a Dav El/Boston Coach
Represented By: Claire Martirosian
Represented By: Gregory J Hollon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DDSSBOS LLC a Massachusetts limited liability company doing business as Dav El/Boston Coach
Represented By: Claire Martirosian
Represented By: Gregory J Hollon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Represented By: Ian Rogers
Represented By: David A. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?