Jacobs et al v. Nationwide Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Stacey Jacobs and Brandy Jacobs
Defendant: Nationwide Insurance Company of America doing business as Nationwide, an insurance company and Nationwide Insurance Company of America doing business as Nationwide
Case Number: 2:2022cv00262
Filed: March 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Jury Trial is set for 7/17/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Length of Trial: *5-6 days*. Joinder of Parties due by 5/31/2022, Amended Pleadings due by 5/31/2022, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 1/18/2023, Motions due by 2/17/2023, Discovery completed by 3/20/2023, Dispositive motions due by 4/18/2023, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 6/2/2023, Motions in Limine due by 6/20/2023, Pretrial Order due by 7/5/2023, Trial briefs to be submitted by 7/12/2023, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 7/12/2023. (LC)
April 28, 2022 Filing 11 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 6. (McLean, Westin)
April 27, 2022 Filing 10 Stipulated MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiffs Brandy Jacobs, Stacey Jacobs. Noting Date 4/27/2022, (Hanson, Joel)
March 25, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Gardner Urquidi Reed for Defendant Nationwide Insurance Company of America. (Reed, Gardner)
March 22, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Joel B Hanson for Plaintiffs Brandy Jacobs, Stacey Jacobs from June 27 to July 21, 2022. (Hanson, Joel)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 4/29/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 4/15/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/22/2022. (LC)
March 16, 2022 Filing 6 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiffs Brandy Jacobs, Stacey Jacobs (Hanson, Joel)
March 10, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint; and Affirmative Defenses with JURY DEMAND by Nationwide Insurance Company of America.(McLean, Westin)
March 7, 2022 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (MV)
March 7, 2022 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (MV)
March 4, 2022 Filing 3 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Nationwide Insurance Company of America (Bentson, Daniel)
March 4, 2022 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Allied Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Allied Holdings (Delaware) Inc. for Nationwide Insurance Company of America. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America (Bentson, Daniel)
March 4, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 22-2-00328-6; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7463138), filed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit Remaining State Court Records)(Bentson, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobs et al v. Nationwide Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Jacobs
Represented By: Joel B Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy Jacobs
Represented By: Joel B Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Insurance Company of America doing business as Nationwide, an insurance company
Represented By: Daniel Rahn Bentson
Represented By: Gardner Urquidi Reed
Represented By: Westin T McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Insurance Company of America doing business as Nationwide
Represented By: Daniel Rahn Bentson
Represented By: Westin T McLean
Represented By: Gardner Urquidi Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?