Smith v. STK Bellevue LLC
Plaintiff: Katurah Smith
Defendant: STK Bellevue, LLC and STK Bellevue LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv00332
Filed: March 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Parties' #9 Stipulated MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(MW)
April 4, 2022 Filing 9 Stipulated MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration, filed by Defendant STK Bellevue LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wall, Christopher)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting Parties' #6 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant's time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Dkt. 1-1 at 10-19) is extended from 3/25/2022 to 4/4/2022. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(MW)
March 31, 2022 Filing 7 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant STK Bellevue LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wall, Christopher)
March 25, 2022 Filing 6 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendant STK Bellevue LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/25/2022, (Wall, Christopher) Modified on 3/25/2022 (MW).
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the Standing Order for Civil Cases Setting Trial Date, Related Dates, and Court Procedures ("Standing Order") [Dkt. No. #5 ], the Court HEREBY STRIKES the noting date for the Parties' Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint [Dkt. No. #6 ]. This Minute Order does not strike the stipulated motion; rather, it strikes the noting date. The Court considers the stipulated motion upon filing. In the future, the Court expects the parties to comply with the terms of the Standing Order. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (MW)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC)
March 23, 2022 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (RE)
March 23, 2022 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #1 Notice of Removal, : Added Complaint as a separate docket entry. (RE)
March 23, 2022 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (RE)
March 18, 2022 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate The ONE Group, LLC, Other Affiliate ONE Group Hospitality, Inc. for STK Bellevue, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by STK Bellevue, LLC (Wall, Christopher)
March 18, 2022 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Keitha Francis re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant STK Bellevue, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wall, Christopher)
March 18, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 22-2-02168-3-SEA; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7480338) Attorney Christopher T Wall added to party STK Bellevue, LLC(pty:dft), filed by STK Bellevue, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wall, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/23/2022: #3 Complaint Only) (RE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. STK Bellevue LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katurah Smith
Represented By: Gregory M Skidmore
Represented By: James Brian Pizl
Represented By: Kaitlyn Moran Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STK Bellevue, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline Middleton
Represented By: Christopher T Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STK Bellevue LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline Middleton
Represented By: Christopher T Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?