Caudel et al v. Amazon.Com Inc
Plaintiff: Amanda Caudel, Allison Carranza-Moreno, Cathy Diomartich and Shaney Scott
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc
Case Number: 2:2022cv00401
Filed: March 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER re #58 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney George V Granade for Plaintiff Amanda Caudel by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY George V. Granade FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Allison Carranza-Moreno, Amanda Caudel, Cathy Diomartich, Shaney Scott (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7555362 (Murray, Jennifer)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Carlos F. Ramirez FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Allison Carranza-Moreno, Amanda Caudel, Cathy Diomartich, Shaney Scott (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7555338 (Murray, Jennifer)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Michael Robert Reese FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Allison Carranza-Moreno, Amanda Caudel, Cathy Diomartich, Shaney Scott (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7555325 (Murray, Jennifer)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Adrienne McEntee on behalf of Plaintiffs Allison Carranza-Moreno, Amanda Caudel, Cathy Diomartich, Shaney Scott. (McEntee, Adrienne)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jennifer Rust Murray on behalf of Plaintiffs Allison Carranza-Moreno, Amanda Caudel, Cathy Diomartich, Shaney Scott. (Murray, Jennifer)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Beth E Terrell on behalf of Plaintiffs Allison Carranza-Moreno, Amanda Caudel, Cathy Diomartich, Shaney Scott. (Terrell, Beth)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER re #49 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney David T Biderman for Defendant Amazon.com Inc by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mallory Gitt Webster on behalf of Defendant Amazon.com Inc. (Webster, Mallory)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Amazon.com Inc (Sipos, Charles)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David T. Biderman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Amazon.com Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7506043 (Sipos, Charles)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Amazon.com Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 4/12/2022. (MET)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 LETTER from Clerk to to counsel re receipt of case from Eastern District of California, Sacramento and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (RE)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (RE)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Case transferred in from Eastern District of California, Case Number 2:20-cv-00848-KJM-KJN.
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/25/2022 TRANSFERRING this case to the USDC, Western District of Washington. CASE TRANSFERRED. (Huang, H) [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Transferring Venue to the USDC for the Western District of Washington by Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Sipos, PHV, Charles) [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/25/2022: The parties' Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time, ECF No. #43 , is GRANTED. Accordingly, Defendant's response to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, ECF No. #40 , shall be filed on or before 03/24/2022. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 3/10/2022 is RESET for 04/21/2022 at 2:30 PM before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, with the filing of a joint status report due fourteen days prior. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C) [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time for Defendant to Respond re #40 Amended Complaint by Amazon.Com, Inc. (Tobin, Thomas) Modified on 2/24/2022 (Mena-Sanchez, L). [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/20/2022 EXTENDING #41 to 2/22/2022 that defendant's time for filing its responsive pleading to #40 the First Amended Complaint.(Reader, L) [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to #40 First Amended Complaint by Amazon.Com, Inc. (Tobin, Thomas) [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Amanda Caudel, Allison Carranza-Moreno, Cathy Diomartich, Shaney Scott. Attorney Ramirez, Carlos F. added.(Ramirez, Carlos) [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy L. Kennison for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/22/2021: The court DISCHARGES the Order to Show Cause, ECF No. #37 . Plaintiff's Amended Complaint shall be filed by 1/11/2022. (Text Only Entry)(Kennison, L) [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 RESPONSE to #37 Order to Show Cause by Amanda Caudel. (Attachments: #1 Amended Class Action Complaint)(Ramirez, Carlos) Modified on 12/2/2021 (Coll, A). [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/17/21 ORDERING plaintiff to show cause why the court should not dismiss and close this case for plaintiff's failure to prosecute and comply with court orders. Plaintiff shall file a response within fourteen days. The court vacates the December 2 Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference and resets it for 3/10/2022 at 02:30 PM. The parties shall file a joint status report fourteen days prior to the March 10th date if it remains on calendar. (Kaminski, H) [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/15/21 GRANTING #14 Motion to Dismiss; Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint within 30 days, if they are able to do so while complying with FRCP 11. (Benson, A.) [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/21/2021: In light of the pending Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. #14 , the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 9/30/2021 is RESET for 12/2/2021 at 2:30 PM before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, with the filing of an updated joint status report due fourteen (14) days prior. The December Hearing will proceed by video conferencing through the Zoom application. The Courtroom Deputy will provide counsel with the hearing access information no less than 24 hours before the hearing. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C) [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Tobin, Thomas) [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Amazon.Com, Inc. (Sipos, PHV, Charles) [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/3/2021: In light of the pending Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. #14 , the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 6/17/2021 is RESET for 9/30/2021 at 2:30 PM before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, with the filing of an updated joint status report due fourteen (14) days prior. The September Hearing will proceed by video conferencing through the Zoom application. The Courtroom Deputy will provide counsel with the hearing access information no less than 24 hours before the hearing (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C) [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Tobin, Thomas) [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 RESPONSE by Amazon.Com, Inc. to #29 Notice of Supplemental Authority. (Tobin, Thomas) [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by Amanda Caudel re #18 Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ramirez, Carlos) [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy M. York for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/6/2021: On the court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. #14 , is SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing date of 4/16/2021, is VACATED. If the court determines that oral argument is needed, it will be scheduled at a later date. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Status Pretrial Scheduling Conference set for 4/16/2021, is RESET for 6/17/2021, at 2:30 PM, before Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, with the filing of an updated joint status report due fourteen (14) days prior. (Text Only Entry) (York, M) [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Tobin, Thomas) [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/1/2021: This court, having reviewed the parties' Stipulation for Continuing Motion Hearing and Scheduling Conference, ECF No. #25 , RESETS the 2/19/2021 Status Pretrial Scheduling Conference to 4/16/2021 at 10:00 AM before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, with the filing of a Joint Status Report due no less than fourteen (14) days prior. The court also RESETS the Motion Hearing as to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. #14 , to 4/16/2021 at 10:00 AM before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C) [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuing Hearing and Scheduling Conference by Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Tobin, Thomas) [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REPLY by Amazon.Com, Inc. re #14 Motion to Dismiss. (Tobin, Thomas) [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: In light of the time needed for Defendant to file a reply, the parties' Joint Stipulation Amending Briefing Schedule, ECF No. #22 , is GRANTED. Accordingly, the Motion Hearing as to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. #14 , set for 1/22/2021 is RESET for 2/19/2021 at 10:00 AM, with Defendant's reply brief due no later than 1/15/2021. It is FURTHER ORDERED, that on the court's own motion the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 1/22/2021 is RESET for 2/19/2021 at 10:00 AM, with the filing of a joint status report due fourteen (14) days prior. The February Status Conference and Motion Hearing will proceed before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller by video conferencing through the Zoom application. The Courtroom Deputy will provide counsel with the hearing access information no later than 10:00 AM on 2/18/2021.(Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C) [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Amending Briefing Schedule and Continuing Scheduling Conference by Amazon.Com, Inc. (Tobin, Thomas) Modified on 1/4/2021 (Huang, H). [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/28/2020. Added attorney Charles Sipos, PHV for Amazon.Com, Inc. (Coll, A) [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 EXHIBIT Certificate of Good Standing by Amazon.Com, Inc. re #19 Pro Hac Vice Application. (Tobin, Thomas) [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Amazon.Com, Inc. for attorney Charles C. Sipos to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9326248) (Tobin, Thomas) [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 OPPOSITION by Amanda Caudel to #14 Motion to Dismiss,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Carlos Ramirez)(Ramirez, Carlos) [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/30/2020 ORDERING that Plaintiff's Opposition to #14 Motion to Dismiss is due by 12/15/2020 and Defendant's Reply is due by 1/8/2021. (Huang, H) [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Amended Briefing Schedule re #14 Motion to Dismiss by Amanda Caudel. (Reese, Michael) [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Amazon.Com, Inc. in re #14 Motion to Dismiss,. (Tobin, Thomas) [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to DISMISS by Amazon.Com, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Marcela Viegas, #3 Declaration of Thomas Tobin, #4 Proposed Order)(Tobin, Thomas) Modified on 10/27/2020 (Kaminski, H). [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: The parties' Joint Stipulation to Amend Briefing Schedule and Continuing Scheduling Conference, ECF No. #12 , is GRANTED. Accordingly, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 12/11/2020 is RESET for 1/22/2021 at 10:00 AM, with the filing of a joint status report due fourteen (14) days prior; Defendant's anticipated Motion to Dismiss in response to the Complaint shall be filed no later than 10/26/2020, and noticed for hearing on 1/22/2021 at 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Plaintiff's Opposition shall be filed no later than 11/23/2020; and Defendant's Reply shall be filed by 12/9/2020. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C) [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Amending Briefing Schedule and Continuing Scheduling Conference re #10 Stipulation and Proposed Order, 11 Minute Order by Amazon.Com, Inc. (Tobin, Thomas) Modified on 10/9/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L). [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: In light of the parties' stipulated agreement to allow Defendants an additional 28 days to respond to the Complaint, ECF No. #1 , the parties' joint request to continue the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference is GRANTED, and the proposed briefing schedule on the anticipated Motion to Dismiss is ADOPTED. See ECF No. #10 . Accordingly, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 9/3/2020 is RESET for 12/11/2020 at 10:00 AM, with the filing of a joint status report due fourteen (14) days prior; Defendant's anticipated Motion to Dismiss in response to the Complaint shall be filed no later than 10/12/2020, and noticed for hearing on 12/11/2020 at 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Plaintiff's Opposition shall be filed no later than 11/9/2020; and Defendant's Reply shall be filed by 11/23/2020. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C) [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Setting Briefing Schedule and Continuing Scheduling Conference by Amazon.Com, Inc.. Attorney Tobin, Thomas John added. (Tobin, Thomas) [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Amazon.Com, Inc. on 7/16/2020, Answer due 9/14/2020 (Granade, George) [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/28/2020 ADDING Attorney Spencer Sheehan, PHV for Amazon.Com, Inc. (Kastilahn, A) [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/28/2020 ADDING Attorney Carlos F. Ramirez, PHV for Amazon.Com, Inc. (Kastilahn, A) Modified on 8/24/2020 (Coll, A). [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Amanda Caudel for attorney Spencer Sheehan to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8908713) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Granade, George) [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Amanda Caudel for attorney Carlos F. Ramirez to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8908653) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Granade, George) [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by George Volney Granade, II on behalf of Amanda Caudel. Attorney Granade, George Volney added. (Granade, George) [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/3/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.) [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Amazon.Com, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael Reese* *Reese Richman LLP* *875 Avenue of the Americas, 18th Floor* *New York, NY 10001*. (Benson, A.) [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amazon.Com, Inc. by Amanda Caudel. Attorney Reese, Michael added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8861785) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reese, Michael) [Transferred from caed on 3/30/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caudel et al v. Amazon.Com Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Caudel
Represented By: Carlos F. Ramirez, PHV
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Represented By: George Volney Granade, II
Represented By: Michael Robert Reese
Represented By: Spencer Sheehan, PHV
Represented By: George V Granade
Represented By: Adrienne McEntee
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Represented By: Jennifer Rust Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Carranza-Moreno
Represented By: Carlos F. Ramirez, PHV
Represented By: Adrienne McEntee
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Represented By: Jennifer Rust Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Diomartich
Represented By: Carlos F. Ramirez, PHV
Represented By: Adrienne McEntee
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Represented By: Jennifer Rust Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaney Scott
Represented By: Carlos F. Ramirez, PHV
Represented By: Adrienne McEntee
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Represented By: Jennifer Rust Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc
Represented By: Thomas John Tobin
Represented By: Charles Sipos, PHV
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Represented By: David T Biderman
Represented By: Charles Christian Sipos
Represented By: Thomas J Tobin
Represented By: Mallory Gitt Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?