CLM Trading LLC v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: CLM Trading LLC d/b/a Mekong Rainier Supermarket and CLM Trading LLC doing business as Mekong Rainier Supermarket
Defendant: United States of America and Stacy Dean
Case Number: 2:2022cv00458
Filed: April 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ENTRY SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT DATES All counsel and any pro se parties are directed to meet and confer and to provide the Court with a combined Joint Status Report (the Report) by the deadline set below. This meet-and-confer must be a face-to-face meeting or a telephonic conference. If the parties are unable to agree on any part of the Report, they may answer in separate paragraphs; no separate reports are to be filed. The Report must contain the following information: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; and 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation.The deadlines below may be extended only by court order. Any request for extension of these deadlines should be made by email to Courtroom Deputy Clerk Gabriel Traber at gabriel_traber@wawd.uscourts.gov. The parties who have appeared in this matter must meet and confer before contacting the Court to request an extension. If this case involves claims that are exempt from the requirements of FRCP 26(a) and 26(f), please notify the Courtroom Deputy Clerk. Please note: Initial Disclosures are not to be filed. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/19/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/26/2022, Joint Status Report due by 9/2/2022. (GT)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ashley C Burns on behalf of Defendants Stacy Dean, United States of America. (Burns, Ashley)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by CLM Trading LLC (Westinghouse, Robert)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Stacy Dean, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(RE)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) CLM Trading LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 4/15/2022. (RE)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (RE)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Stacy Dean, United States of America (Receipt # AWAWDC-7506126), filed by CLM Trading LLC d/b/a Mekong Rainier Supermarket. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons to the United States of America, #4 Summons Stacy Dean, in her official capacity)(Westinghouse, Robert) (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/13/2022 to flatten malformed PDF) (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CLM Trading LLC v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLM Trading LLC d/b/a Mekong Rainier Supermarket
Represented By: Robert H. Westinghouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLM Trading LLC doing business as Mekong Rainier Supermarket
Represented By: Robert H. Westinghouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Ashley C Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy Dean
Represented By: Ashley C Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?