Benson Mills Inc v. Weifeng
Plaintiff: Benson Mills Inc
Defendant: Weng Weifeng
Case Number: 2:2022cv00466
Filed: April 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: At the parties' request, an extension of time to file the joint status report is granted. The report will be due on 8/1/2022. Failure to adhere to this deadline may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. Authorized by Judge Barbara J Rothstein. (GC)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 6/16/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 6/2/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/9/2022. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Benson Mills Inc (Kolter, Erin)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff Benson Mills Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 4/20/2022. (KB)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Benson Mills Inc (Kolter, Erin)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Weng Weifeng (MJV)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office (MJV)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint,. ***Action Required*** Jury Demand Improperly Indicated.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (MJV)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (MJV)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against defendant(s) Weng Weifeng with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7507624) Attorney Erin C Kolter added to party Benson Mills Inc(pty:pla), filed by Benson Mills Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121), #5 Summons)(Kolter, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benson Mills Inc v. Weifeng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benson Mills Inc
Represented By: Erin C Kolter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weng Weifeng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?