Wengeler v. Yellen et al
Plaintiff: Carl Wengeler
Defendant: Janet Yellen, Department of Treasury, Office of Controller of Currency and Craft3
Case Number: 2:2022cv00666
Filed: May 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Lauren King
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Dismissing Amended Complaint with Prejudice. The Court DENIES Plaintiff's motions for miscellaneous relief. Dkt. Nos. #13 , #14 . With respect to his motion to seal, within 20 days of this Order Mr. Wengeler may file an amended motion that addresses the criteria set forth above. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (MW) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
June 23, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff Carl Wengeler. Noted by Clerk for 7/8/2022 (MW)
June 23, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Restraining Order, filed by Plaintiff Carl Wengeler. Noted by Clerk for 6/23/2022 (MW)
June 17, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Amend Previous Rule 65, MOTION to Submit Evidence, and MOTION to Seal Case, filed by Plaintiff Carl Wengeler. Noted by Clerk for 7/8/2022. (MW)
June 15, 2022 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Craft3, Department of Treasury, Office of Controller of Currency, Janet Yellen, filed by Carl Wengeler.(MW)
June 3, 2022 Filing 11 Additional Information re Motion for Injunction, filed by Plaintiff Carl Wengeler (MW)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Court DENIES Mr. Wengeler's Motion to Appoint Counsel, Dkt. No. #8 , and Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Dkt. No. #9 . The Court further DISMISSES Mr. Wengeler's complaint without prejudice and with leave to amend within 20 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Lauren King.(MW) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
May 31, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Plaintiff Carl Wengeler. Noting Date 5/31/2022 (MW)
May 24, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff Carl Wengeler. Noted by Clerk for 6/10/2022 (MW)
May 24, 2022 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Craft3, Department of Treasury, Office of Controller of Currency, Janet Yellen (Receipt # IFP Granted), filed by Carl Wengeler.(MW)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The undersigned recommends review by the assigned District Judge under 28 U.S.C. 1915. Signed by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan.(MW) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
May 19, 2022 Filing 5 IFP deficiency corrected re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #4 Case/IFP Deficiency Letter. (Attachments: #1 copy of complaint)(MW)
May 18, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Corrected signature page must be filed by 6/1/2022. (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) (JWC)
May 18, 2022 Filing 3 DISREGARD Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Corrected signature page must be filed by 6/1/2022. (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) (JWC) Modified on 5/18/2022 (JWC).
May 17, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. ***Action Required***See attached letter for more information and instructions. (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) (JWC)
May 16, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Carl Wengeler. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Application for Court-Appointed Counsel) Case assignment sheet given to Pro Se Plaintiff at intake window (JWC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wengeler v. Yellen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Wengeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Yellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Controller of Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craft3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?