Taneja et al v. Freitas et al
Plaintiff: Latika Taneja, Navneet Taneja, Viral Desai and Dharitri Desai
Defendant: Alinne Cintra Freitas, Pedro Henrique Freitas, Freitas Community Estate, Love Laugh Learn Daycare, LLC and Love Laugh Learn Daycare LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv00702
Filed: May 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Tana Lin
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING BENCH TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge Tana Lin. Bench Trial is set for 8/28/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Tana Lin.Length of trial: 4-5 days, Joinder of Parties due by 10/14/2022, Amended Pleadings due by 11/14/2022, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 2/3/2023, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 3/6/2023, Motions due by 3/6/2023, Discovery completed by 4/3/2023, Dispositive motions due by 4/28/2023, 39.1 Settlement conference to be completed by 5/30/2023, 39.1 Mediation to be completed by 6/29/2023, Motions in Limine due by 7/24/2023, Pretrial Order due by 8/7/2023, Trial briefs/Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 8/14/2023, Pretrial Conference set for 8/21/2023 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Tana Lin. (KMP)
July 8, 2022 NOTICE TO FILER re #12 Initial Disclosures. Per LCR 5 (d), discovery documents are not to be filed in your court case. (LH)
July 7, 2022 Filing 12 INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Defendants Alinne Cintra Freitas, Pedro Henrique Freitas, Freitas Community Estate, Love Laugh Learn Daycare LLC.(Abell, Hunter)
July 6, 2022 Filing 11 Amended STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs Dharitri Desai, Viral Desai, Latika Taneja, Navneet Taneja (Gunter, Daniel)
June 30, 2022 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER (text only) re Deficient Joint Status Report (Dkt. No. #9 ) made at the direction of Judge Tana Lin: This Court's initial case scheduling order requires that joint status reports include the following certifications: (1) a certification that all counsel and any pro se parties have reviewed Judge Lin's Chambers Procedures (available at https://www.wawd.uscourts.gov/judges/lin-procedures), the Local Rules, General Orders and the applicable Electronic Filing Procedures; and (2) a certification that all counsel and any pro se parties have reviewed and complied with Judge Lin's Standing Order Regarding 28 U.S.C. 455 and Canon 3 of the Code of Conduct for United States Judges. The Court directs the parties to file an amended joint status report including these required certifications within three (3) days of this Order. (KMP)
June 28, 2022 Filing 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 5. (Gunter, Daniel)
June 21, 2022 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Alinne Cintra Freitas, Pedro Henrique Freitas, Freitas Community Estate, Love Laugh Learn Daycare LLC (Abell, Hunter)
May 26, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Adam Rosenberg for Defendants Alinne Cintra Freitas, Pedro Henrique Freitas, Freitas Community Estate, Love Laugh Learn Daycare LLC from May 30, 2022 to June 3, 2022. (Rosenberg, Adam)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Tana Lin. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 6/23/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/7/2022, Joint Status Report due by 7/21/2022. (KMP)
May 26, 2022 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER (text only) made at the direction of Judge Tana Lin: The Court has posted Chambers Procedures at http://www.wawd.uscourts.gov/judges/lin-procedures. All counsel and unrepresented ("pro se") parties are DIRECTED to review them, if they have not already done so. Failure to follow the requirements set forth in the Chambers Procedures may result in the imposition of sanctions. (KMP)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455 AND CANON 3 OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Tana Lin. (KMP)
May 25, 2022 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (RE)
May 25, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Attorney Admission.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (RE)
May 25, 2022 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant Love Laugh Learn Daycare, LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 6/1/2022. (RE)
May 25, 2022 Judge Tana Lin added. (RE)
May 24, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King, case number 22-2-04361-0SEA; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7564701), filed by Love Laugh Learn Daycare, LLC, Alinne Cintra Freitas, Pedro Henrique Freitas, Freitas Community Estate. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Attachment A, #3 Complaint, #4 Supplement)(Rosenberg, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taneja et al v. Freitas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latika Taneja
Represented By: Daniel J Gunter
Represented By: Mark D Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Navneet Taneja
Represented By: Daniel J Gunter
Represented By: Mark D Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viral Desai
Represented By: Daniel J Gunter
Represented By: Mark D Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dharitri Desai
Represented By: Daniel J Gunter
Represented By: Mark D Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alinne Cintra Freitas
Represented By: Adam Rosenberg
Represented By: Hunter M Abell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pedro Henrique Freitas
Represented By: Adam Rosenberg
Represented By: Hunter M Abell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freitas Community Estate
Represented By: Adam Rosenberg
Represented By: Hunter M Abell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Love Laugh Learn Daycare, LLC
Represented By: Adam Rosenberg
Represented By: Hunter M Abell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Love Laugh Learn Daycare LLC
Represented By: Adam Rosenberg
Represented By: Hunter M Abell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?