Umouyo et al v. Bank of America NA et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A., Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, Henry A. Umouyo, anidei H. umouyo, Aztec Foreclosure Corp. of Washington, Henry A Umouyo and Aniedi H Umouyo
Defendant: Bank of America NA, Carrington Mortgage Services LLC, Aztec Foreclosures Corp of Washington and Unknown Heirs
Case Number: 2:2022cv00704
Filed: May 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John H Chun
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Declaratory Judgemen
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REPLY, filed by Defendants Bank of America NA, Carrington Mortgage Services LLC, TO RESPONSE to #17 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Wozniak, Lukasz)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Henry A Umouyo, to #17 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Declaration of Henry Umouyo)(Umouyo, Henry)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #8 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge John H. Chun. (SB) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER striking as moot Defendants' #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge John H. Chun. (LH) (cc: Plaintiff Umouyo via US mail)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge John H. Chun for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge David W. Christel no longer assigned to case, by Clerk, Ravi Subramanian. (KEB)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #17 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Wozniak, Lukasz)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REQUEST for Judicial Notice by Defendants Bank of America NA, Carrington Mortgage Services LLC re #17 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Wozniak, Lukasz)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, filed by Defendants Bank of America NA, Carrington Mortgage Services LLC. Noting Date 7/22/2022, (Wozniak, Lukasz)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Henry A Umouyo, TO RESPONSE to #8 MOTION to Remand to King County Sup. Court, Kent. (Umouyo, Henry)
June 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Henry A Umouyo, to #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Umouyo, Henry)
June 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Henry A Umouyo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 21)(Umouyo, Henry)
June 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE, by Defendants Bank of America NA, Carrington Mortgage Services LLC, to #8 MOTION to Remand to King County Sup. Court, Kent.. (Wozniak, Lukasz)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 7/12/2022. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (cc: Plaintiff) (KEB)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Attorney James A Craft for Aztec Foreclosures Corp of Washington added; per #11 Verification of State Court Records. (AMD)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, Copies of All Additional Records and Proceedings by Defendants Bank of America NA, Carrington Mortgage Services LLC (Wozniak, Lukasz)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Bank of America NA, Carrington Mortgage Services LLC (Wozniak, Lukasz)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff Henry A Umouyo re #8 MOTION to Remand to King County Sup. Court, Kent. Supplemental Brief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Umouyo, Henry)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to King County Sup. Court, Kent., filed by Plaintiff Henry A Umouyo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order Proposed order) Noting Date 6/24/2022, (Umouyo, Henry)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Noting Date Set re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim: Noting Date 6/24/2022. (ZMG)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST by Defendants Bank of America NA, Carrington Mortgage Services LLC for Judicial Notice re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Wozniak, Lukasz)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by Defendants Bank of America NA, Carrington Mortgage Services LLC. Noted by Clerk for 6/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wozniak, Lukasz) Modified on 6/1/2022 (ZMG).
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE: Plaintiff Henry A Umouyo has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (KB)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (cc plaintiffs via USPS) (RE)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Added corporate parent/affiliates. (RE)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge David W. Christel added. (RE)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating BANA is an affiliate of Bank of America Corp. (BAC). BAC is a publicly traded company and, upon information and belief, Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. owns more than 10% of its stock. Carrington Mortgage Services, LLCs members are Carrington Holding Company, LLC and Carrington Investment Partners, L.P. Carrington Holding Company, LLC liability company, whose sole member is The Carrington Companies, LLC. Carrington Investment Partners, L.P. general partner is Carrington Capital Management, LLC. Carrington Capital Management, LLC company, members are Carrington Holding Company, LLC and a private individual. The Carrington Companies, LLC is a Delaware limited liability company. There are no publicly held corporations holding stock in the amount of 10% or more in The Carrington Companies, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Bank of America, N.A., Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC (Wozniak, Lukasz) Modified on 5/26/2022 to add corporations/affiliates. (RE)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 22-2-05927-3-KNT; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7564770) Attorney Lukasz I Wozniak added to party Bank of America, N.A.(pty:pla), Attorney Lukasz I Wozniak added to party Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Bank of America, N.A., Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wozniak, Lukasz) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/26/2022: #2 Complaint) (RE).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Umouyo et al v. Bank of America NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Lukasz I Wozniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Represented By: Lukasz I Wozniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry A. Umouyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: anidei H. umouyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aztec Foreclosure Corp. of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry A Umouyo
Represented By: Henry A Umouyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aniedi H Umouyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America NA
Represented By: Lukasz I Wozniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services LLC
Represented By: Lukasz I Wozniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aztec Foreclosures Corp of Washington
Represented By: James A Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Heirs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?