Gimbel v. Bezos et al
Plaintiff: Francis Gimbel, Jr. and Francis Gimbel, Jr
Defendant: Jeffrey P Bezos, Andrew R Jassy, Brian T Olsavsky, David H Clark, Shelley L Reynolds, Adam N Selipsky, David Zapolsky, Keith B Alexander, Edith W Cooper, Jamie S Gorelick, Daniel P Huttenlocher, Judith A McGrath, Indra K Nooyi, Jonathan J Rubinstein, Patricia Q Stonesifer, Wendell P Weeks, Tom A Alberg, Rosalind Brewer, Thomas O Ryder and Nate Sutton
Nominal Defendant: Amazon.com Inc
Case Number: 2:2022cv00811
Filed: June 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re Parties' #15 Stipulated MOTION to Consolidate Related Shareholder Derivative Actions. The files of these consolidated actions shall be maintained in one file under Lead Case No. 2:22-cv-00559. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (SR)
July 7, 2022 Filing 15 Stipulated MOTION to Consolidate Related Shareholder Derivative Actions, filed by Plaintiff Francis Gimbel, Jr. Noting Date 7/7/2022, (Wesner, Gregory)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/19/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/26/2022, Joint Status Report due by 8/2/2022, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
July 1, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Yukiu Monica Chan on behalf of Defendants Tom A Alberg, Keith B Alexander, Jeffrey P Bezos, Rosalind Brewer, David H Clark, Edith W Cooper, Jamie S Gorelick, Daniel P Huttenlocher, Andrew R Jassy, Judith A McGrath, Indra K Nooyi, Brian T Olsavsky, Shelley L Reynolds, Jonathan J Rubinstein, Thomas O Ryder, Adam N Selipsky, Patricia Q Stonesifer, Nate Sutton, Wendell P Weeks, David Zapolsky, Nominal Defendant Amazon.com Inc. (Chan, Yukiu)
July 1, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brian D Buckley on behalf of Defendants Tom A Alberg, Keith B Alexander, Jeffrey P Bezos, Rosalind Brewer, David H Clark, Edith W Cooper, Jamie S Gorelick, Daniel P Huttenlocher, Andrew R Jassy, Judith A McGrath, Indra K Nooyi, Brian T Olsavsky, Shelley L Reynolds, Jonathan J Rubinstein, Thomas O Ryder, Adam N Selipsky, Patricia Q Stonesifer, Nate Sutton, Wendell P Weeks, David Zapolsky, Nominal Defendant Amazon.com Inc. (Buckley, Brian)
June 27, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Tom A Alberg mailed on 6/24/2022; Keith B Alexander mailed on 6/24/2022; Amazon.com Inc mailed on 6/24/2022; Jeffrey P Bezos mailed on 6/24/2022; Rosalind Brewer mailed on 6/24/2022; David H Clark mailed on 6/24/2022; Edith W Cooper mailed on 6/24/2022; Jamie S Gorelick mailed on 6/24/2022; Daniel P Huttenlocher mailed on 6/24/2022; Andrew R Jassy mailed on 6/24/2022; Judith A McGrath mailed on 6/24/2022; Indra K Nooyi mailed on 6/24/2022; Brian T Olsavsky mailed on 6/24/2022; Shelley L Reynolds mailed on 6/24/2022; Jonathan J Rubinstein mailed on 6/24/2022; Thomas O Ryder mailed on 6/24/2022; Adam N Selipsky mailed on 6/24/2022; Patricia Q Stonesifer mailed on 6/24/2022; Nate Sutton mailed on 6/24/2022; Wendell P Weeks mailed on 6/24/2022; David Zapolsky mailed on 6/24/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Names of Parties Waiving Service of Summons)(Wesner, Gregory)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Michael I Fistel, Jr for Plaintiff Francis Gimbel, Jr by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Frank Johnson for Plaintiff Francis Gimbel, Jr by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
June 27, 2022 Filing 8 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Michael I. Fistel, Jr. FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Francis Gimbel, Jr (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7606782 (Wesner, Gregory)
June 27, 2022 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Frank Johnson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Francis Gimbel, Jr (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7606767 (Wesner, Gregory)
June 22, 2022 Filing 6 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
June 21, 2022 Case Reassigned to Judge Richard A. Jones as related to C22-559RAJ. Judge John H. Chun no longer assigned to the case. (AD)
June 13, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:22-cv-00559-RAJ, by Plaintiff Francis Gimbel, Jr. (Wesner, Gregory)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT)
June 13, 2022 Case Reassigned to Judge John H. Chun. U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour no longer assigned to the case. (GT)
June 10, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint. ***Action Required*** Notice of Related Cases Omitted.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Notice of Related Case must be filed by 6/15/2022. (JWC)
June 10, 2022 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to Defendant(s) Tom A Alberg, Keith B Alexander, Jeffrey P Bezos, Rosalind Brewer, David H Clark, Edith W Cooper, Jamie S Gorelick, Daniel P Huttenlocher, Andrew R Jassy, Judith A McGrath, Indra K Nooyi, Brian T Olsavsky, Shelley L Reynolds, Jonathan J Rubinstein, Thomas O Ryder, Adam N Selipsky, Patricia Q Stonesifer, Nate Sutton, Wendell P Weeks, David Zapolsky, and Nominal Defendant Amazon.com Inc. (JWC)
June 10, 2022 U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (JWC)
June 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Stockholder Derivative Complaint against defendant(s) Tom A Alberg, Keith B Alexander, Amazon.com Inc, Jeffrey P Bezos, Rosalind Brewer, David H Clark, Edith W Cooper, Jamie S Gorelick, Daniel P Huttenlocher, Andrew R Jassy, Judith A McGrath, Indra K Nooyi, Brian T Olsavsky, Shelley L Reynolds, Jonathan J Rubinstein, Thomas O Ryder, Adam N Selipsky, Patricia Q Stonesifer, Nate Sutton, Wendell P Weeks, David Zapolsky with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7587049) Attorney Gregory F Wesner added to party Francis Gimbel, Jr(pty:pla), filed by Francis Gimbel, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Wesner, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gimbel v. Bezos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Gimbel, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory F Wesner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Gimbel, Jr
Represented By: Frank Johnson
Represented By: Michael I Fistel, Jr
Represented By: Gregory F Wesner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey P Bezos
Represented By: Brian D Buckley
Represented By: Yukiu Monica Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew R Jassy
Represented By: Brian D Buckley
Represented By: Yukiu Monica Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian T Olsavsky
Represented By: Brian D Buckley
Represented By: Yukiu Monica Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David H Clark
Represented By: Brian D Buckley
Represented By: Yukiu Monica Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelley L Reynolds
Represented By: Brian D Buckley
Represented By: Yukiu Monica Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam N Selipsky
Represented By: Brian D Buckley
Represented By: Yukiu Monica Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Zapolsky
Represented By: Brian D Buckley
Represented By: Yukiu Monica Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith B Alexander
Represented By: Brian D Buckley
Represented By: Yukiu Monica Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edith W Cooper
Represented By: Brian D Buckley
Represented By: Yukiu Monica Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie S Gorelick
Represented By: Brian D Buckley
Represented By: Yukiu Monica Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel P Huttenlocher
Represented By: Brian D Buckley
Represented By: Yukiu Monica Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith A McGrath
Represented By: Brian D Buckley
Represented By: Yukiu Monica Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indra K Nooyi
Represented By: Brian D Buckley
Represented By: Yukiu Monica Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan J Rubinstein
Represented By: Brian D Buckley
Represented By: Yukiu Monica Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Q Stonesifer
Represented By: Brian D Buckley
Represented By: Yukiu Monica Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendell P Weeks
Represented By: Brian D Buckley
Represented By: Yukiu Monica Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom A Alberg
Represented By: Brian D Buckley
Represented By: Yukiu Monica Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosalind Brewer
Represented By: Brian D Buckley
Represented By: Yukiu Monica Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas O Ryder
Represented By: Brian D Buckley
Represented By: Yukiu Monica Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nate Sutton
Represented By: Brian D Buckley
Represented By: Yukiu Monica Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Amazon.com Inc
Represented By: Brian D Buckley
Represented By: Yukiu Monica Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?