Ticey et al v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Troy Ticey and Cynthia Ticey
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, FDIC and Does 1-30
Case Number: 2:2022cv01110
Filed: August 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 10/25/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/11/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/18/2022. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (GC)
August 23, 2022 Filing 6 EXHIBIT REDACTIONS by Plaintiff Troy Ticey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits #9, #2 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit #10, #3 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit #13)(Ticey, Troy)
August 15, 2022 Filing 5 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (SB)
August 12, 2022 Filing 4 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Troy Ticey (Ticey, Troy)
August 11, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE: Plaintiff Troy Ticey has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (JF)
August 11, 2022 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (cc: plaintiff(s) via USPS) (ST)
August 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT,, filed by Troy Ticey, Cynthia Ticey against defendant(s) Does 1-30, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation with JURY DEMAND. (Summons(es) not received to issue) (Receipt # SEA107813) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, SEALED #9 Exhibit 9, SEALED #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, SEALED #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Email from Filer) (Exhibits 9, 10 and 13 sealed as they contain personal identifiers)(ST)
August 8, 2022 NOTICE TO FILER re #1 Complaint. Exhibits 9, 10 and 13 contain personal identifiers that must be redacted per Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(a) and Local Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2 and have been sealed. You must refile a redacted version of the document(s). This will not affect your original filing date. Enclosed are the document(s) that need redaction. (cc: plaintiff(s) w/docket report and copies of Exhibits 9, 10 and 13 via USPS) (ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ticey et al v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FDIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Ticey
Represented By: Troy Ticey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Ticey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?