Gordon v. Potter et al
Plaintiff: John Gordon
Defendant: Corey Potter and F/V Gambler
Case Number: 2:2022cv01375
Filed: September 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Tana Lin
Referring Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 688 Jones Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Tana Lin. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/12/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/27/2022, Joint Status Report due by 1/10/2023. (KMP)
November 14, 2022 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER (text only) made at the direction of Judge Tana Lin: The Court has posted Chambers Procedures at http://www.wawd.uscourts.gov/judges/lin-procedures. All counsel and unrepresented ("pro se") parties are DIRECTED to review them, if they have not already done so. Failure to follow the requirements set forth in the Chambers Procedures may result in the imposition of sanctions. (KMP)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455 AND CANON 3 OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Tana Lin. (KMP)
November 10, 2022 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Case reassigned to Judge Tana Lin for all further proceedings. Hon. Brian A Tsuchida no longer assigned to case. (AQ)
November 8, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 11/15/2022. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (AQ)
November 8, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael A Barcott on behalf of Defendant Corey Potter. (Barcott, Michael)
September 30, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:21-cv-00758-DGE, by Plaintiff John Gordon. (Merriam, John)
September 29, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Corey Potter. (RE)
September 29, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Notice of Related Cases Omitted.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Notice of Related Case must be filed by 10/4/2022. (RE)
September 29, 2022 Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (RE)
September 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by John Gordon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Praecipe)(Merriam, John) (Prepayment Waived)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gordon v. Potter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Gordon
Represented By: John W Merriam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Potter
Represented By: Michael A Barcott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F/V Gambler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?