Nitetek Licensing LLC v. Meter Group Inc
Plaintiff: Nitetek Licensing LLC
Defendant: Meter Group, Inc. and Meter Group Inc
Case Number: 2:2022cv01522
Filed: October 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John H Chun
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2022 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER (text-only) entered upon the authority of Judge John H. Chun. Upon request and agreement of the parties, the Joint Status Report and related deadlines are extended as follows: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is extended to 2/17/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is extended to 3/3/2023, Joint Status Report due by 3/10/2023. (AD)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge John H. Chun. Joint Status Report due by 1/25/2023, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/4/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/18/2023. (AD)
December 7, 2022 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Case reassigned to Judge John H. Chun for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke no longer assigned to case. (GMR)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #10 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Meter Group Inc, by Judge Theresa L Fricke. Defendant answer due 1/12/2023.(KEB)
December 2, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 12/9/2022. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KAM)
December 2, 2022 Filing 10 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , filed by Defendant Meter Group Inc. Noting Date 12/2/2022, (Kolter, Erin)
December 2, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Erin C Kolter on behalf of Defendant Meter Group Inc. (Kolter, Erin)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (GMR)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 1/31/2023, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/17/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/24/2023, by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (GMR)
November 2, 2022 Filing 6 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Meter Group Inc (MW)
November 1, 2022 Filing 5 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Nitetek Licensing LLC (Mann, Philip)
October 28, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint. ***Action Required*** Summons Form Incomplete.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (JWC)
October 28, 2022 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (JWC)
October 28, 2022 Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (JWC)
October 26, 2022 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Nitetek Licensing LLC (Mann, Philip)
October 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement against defendant(s) Meter Group, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7754655) Attorney Philip P Mann added to party Nitetek Licensing LLC(pty:pla), filed by Nitetek Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120), #5 Summons)(Mann, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nitetek Licensing LLC v. Meter Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nitetek Licensing LLC
Represented By: Philip P Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meter Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meter Group Inc
Represented By: Erin C Kolter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?