Amazon.com Inc. et al v. Kitsenka et al
Plaintiff: Amazon.com, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC, The Gillette Company LLC and Amazon.com Inc
Defendant: Dzmitry Kitsenka, Maryia Kitsenka, A_2_Z Store, Best-FBA-Store, IED Store LLC, KirmanLLC, M3 Turbo, MarMur, MaryBy, MegastoreBy and Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2022cv01574
Filed: November 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2022 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Maryia Kitsenka on 11/16/2022, filed by Plaintiffs Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC, The Gillette Company LLC. (Rainwater, Lauren)
December 2, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Dzmitry Kitsenka on 12/16/2022 11/16/2022, filed by Plaintiffs Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC, The Gillette Company LLC. (Rainwater, Lauren) Modified on 12/2/2022 per filer request corrected date of service (STP).
December 2, 2022 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #7 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint: per filer request corrected date of service to 11/16/2022. (STP)
November 8, 2022 Filing 6 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) All Defendants (MJV)
November 8, 2022 Filing 5 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiffs Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC, The Gillette Company LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons MARYIA KITSENKA, #2 Summons MARMUR, #3 Summons A_2_Z STORE, #4 Summons M3 TURBO, #5 Summons BEST-FBA-STORE, #6 Summons MARYBY, #7 Summons MEGASTORBY, #8 Summons KIRMANLLC, #9 Summons IED STORE LLC)(Rainwater, Lauren)
November 8, 2022 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (MJV)
November 8, 2022 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (MJV)
November 4, 2022 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Proctor & Gamble Company for The Gillette Company LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by The Gillette Company LLC (Rainwater, Lauren)
November 4, 2022 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc. (Rainwater, Lauren)
November 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-7766543), filed by The Gillette Company LLC, Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120), #6 Summons A_2_Z STORE, #7 Summons BEST-FBA-STORE, #8 Summons IED STORE LLC, #9 Summons KIRMANLLC, #10 Summons M3 TURBO, #11 Summons MARMUR, #12 Summons MARYBY, #13 Summons MEGASTORBY, #14 Summons DZMITRY KITSENKA, #15 Summons MARYIA KITSENKA)(Rainwater, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amazon.com Inc. et al v. Kitsenka et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren Burdette Rainwater
Represented By: Scott R Commerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amazon.com Services LLC
Represented By: Lauren Burdette Rainwater
Represented By: Scott R Commerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Gillette Company LLC
Represented By: Lauren Burdette Rainwater
Represented By: Scott R Commerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amazon.com Inc
Represented By: Lauren Burdette Rainwater
Represented By: Scott R Commerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dzmitry Kitsenka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryia Kitsenka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A_2_Z Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best-FBA-Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IED Store LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KirmanLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M3 Turbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MarMur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MaryBy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MegastoreBy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?