Adams v. Hal Nederland NV et al
Plaintiff: TRACEY ADAMS
Defendant: HAL NEDERLAND N.V., HOLLAND AMERICA LINE N.V.,, HOLLAND AMERICA LINE- USA INC.,, HOLLAND AMERICA LINE INC.,, HAL ANTILLEN N.V.,, HOLLAND AMERICA LINE USA, INC.,, HAL Nederland NV, Holland America Line NV, Holland America Line - USA Inc, Holland America Line Inc, HAL Antillen NV, Holland America Line USA Inc and XYZ Corporation
Case Number: 2:2022cv01634
Filed: November 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: S Kate Vaughan
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2023 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on HOLLAND AMERICAN LINE, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION on 12/9/2022, filed by Plaintiff Tracey Adams. (Margulies, Jason)
January 6, 2023 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on HOLLAND AMERICAN LINE N.V. A CURACAO CORPORATION on 12/9/2022, filed by Plaintiff Tracey Adams. (Margulies, Jason)
January 6, 2023 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on HOLLAND AMERICAN LINE, INC., A WASHINGTON CORPORATION on 12/9/2022, filed by Plaintiff Tracey Adams. (Margulies, Jason)
January 5, 2023 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on HOLLAND AMERICAN LINE - USA INC on 12/9/2022, filed by Plaintiff Tracey Adams. (Margulies, Jason)
January 5, 2023 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on HAL NEDERLAND N.V., on 12/9/2022, filed by Plaintiff Tracey Adams. (Margulies, Jason)
January 5, 2023 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on HAL ANTILLEN N.V. on 12/9/2022, filed by Plaintiff Tracey Adams. (Margulies, Jason)
November 16, 2022 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) HAL Antillen NV, HAL Nederland NV, Holland America Line - USA Inc, Holland America Line Inc, Holland America Line NV, Holland America Line USA Inc (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(MJV)
November 16, 2022 Hon. S. Kate Vaughan added. (MJV)
November 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7777282) Attorney Jason R Margulies added to party TRACEY ADAMS(pty:pla), filed by TRACEY ADAMS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Margulies, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Hal Nederland NV et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACEY ADAMS
Represented By: Jason R Margulies
Represented By: Olivia Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAL NEDERLAND N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOLLAND AMERICA LINE N.V.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOLLAND AMERICA LINE- USA INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOLLAND AMERICA LINE INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAL ANTILLEN N.V.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOLLAND AMERICA LINE USA, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAL Nederland NV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holland America Line NV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holland America Line - USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holland America Line Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAL Antillen NV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holland America Line USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?