Goins v. Receivables Performance Management LLC
Plaintiff: Helen Goins
Defendant: Receivables Performance Management LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv01692
Filed: November 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER to Consolidate. The Hightower, Shemeyla, Damon, Goins, Jones, and Tristan matters currently pending in this Court, and any other action arising out of the same or similar operative facts now pending or hereafter filed in, removed to, or transferred to this Court, shall be consolidated for pretrial purposes pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42. All papers filed in the Consolidated Action shall be filed under the Hightower Action, 2:22-cv-01683-RSM, the case number assigned to the first-filed case. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SB)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Gary M Klinger for Plaintiff Helen Goins by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
December 14, 2022 Filing 8 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Gary M. Klinger FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Helen Goins (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7812571 (Dennett, Jason)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Joseph M Lyon for Plaintiff Helen Goins by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
December 7, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kim D Stephens on behalf of Plaintiff Helen Goins. (Stephens, Kim)
December 7, 2022 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Joseph M. Lyon FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Helen Goins (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7803129 (Stephens, Kim)
December 1, 2022 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Case reassigned to Judge Ricardo S. Martinez for all further proceedings. Hon. Brian A Tsuchida no longer assigned to case. (AQ)
December 1, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:22-cv-01683-RSM; 2:22-cv-01686-TSZ; 2:22-cv-01691-MJP, by Plaintiff Helen Goins. (Dennett, Jason)
November 30, 2022 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Receivables Performance Management LLC (MJV)
November 30, 2022 Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (MJV)
November 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Receivables Performance Management LLC with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7793400) Attorney Jason T Dennett added to party Helen Goins(pty:pla), filed by Helen Goins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Dennett, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goins v. Receivables Performance Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Goins
Represented By: Kaleigh Boyd
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Joseph M Lyon
Represented By: Gary M Klinger
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Receivables Performance Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?