United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union AFL CIO CLC v. HF Sinclair Puget Sound Refining LLC et al
Plaintiff: United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union (USW) and United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union AFL CIO CLC
Defendant: HF Sinclair Puget Sound Refining, LLC, Shell USA, Inc., HF Sinclair Puget Sound Refining LLC and Shell USA Inc
Case Number: 2:2023cv00027
Filed: January 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2023 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union AFL CIO CLC re #7 RAJ Standing Order (Derry, Sarah)
January 26, 2023 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union AFL CIO CLC re #7 RAJ Standing Order (Derry, Sarah)
January 17, 2023 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on HF Sinclair Puget Sound Refining LLC on 1/10/2023, filed by Plaintiff United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union AFL CIO CLC. (Derry, Sarah)
January 17, 2023 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Shell USA Inc. on 1/10/2023, filed by Plaintiff United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union AFL CIO CLC. (Derry, Sarah)
January 11, 2023 Filing 7 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
January 11, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Thomas C Kaplan on behalf of Plaintiff United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union AFL CIO CLC. (Kaplan, Thomas)
January 11, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kathleen Phair Barnard on behalf of Plaintiff United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union AFL CIO CLC. (Barnard, Kathleen)
January 10, 2023 Filing 4 Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s).See attached letter for more information and instructions. (CR)
January 9, 2023 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) HF Sinclair Puget Sound Refining LLC, Shell USA Inc (Attachments: #1 Summons) (CR)
January 9, 2023 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (CR)
January 6, 2023 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union (USW) (Derry, Sarah)
January 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) HF Sinclair Puget Sound Refining, LLC, Shell USA, Inc. (Receipt # AWAWDC-7838053) Attorney Sarah E. Derry added to party United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union (USW)(pty:pla), filed by United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union (USW). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Shell USA, Inc., #3 Summons HF Sinclair)(Derry, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union AFL CIO CLC v. HF Sinclair Puget Sound Refining LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union (USW)
Represented By: Sarah E. Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union AFL CIO CLC
Represented By: Kathleen Phair Barnard
Represented By: Sarah E. Derry
Represented By: Thomas C Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HF Sinclair Puget Sound Refining, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HF Sinclair Puget Sound Refining LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?