Wright et al v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Michael Wright and Alexis Wright
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Case Number: 2:2023cv00179
Filed: February 6, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Jamal N Whitehead
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 7. (Derenski, Heather)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Judge Jamal N Whitehead. Judge Lauren King no longer assigned to the case. (NAW)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Defendant State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Cause and Origin Report by Davis, #2 Exhibit 2 - Xactimate estimate to determine costs of repair, #3 Exhibit 3 - State Farm Policy and Decl. page)(Furman, Christopher)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant State Farm Fire & Casualty Company (Hicks, James)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint; (Answer to Amended Complaint for Damages) by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company.(Hicks, James)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 3/10/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/24/2023, Joint Status Report due by 4/7/2023. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal,. ***Action Required*** Notice of Removal - Jury Demand Improperly Submitted.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (CDA)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company (Hicks, James)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiffs Alexis Wright, Michael Wright (Derenski, Heather)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (CR)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Judge Lauren King added. (CR)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 2/14/2023. (CR)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 22-2-19205-4; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7878462), filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Cover Sheet re Service, #4 Exhibit 3 - State Court filings, #5 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Removal to State Court)(Hicks, James) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/8/2023 due to malformed PDF) (CDA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright et al v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Wright
Represented By: Heather Derenski
Represented By: Joseph W Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Wright
Represented By: Joseph W Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: Christopher Furman
Represented By: James D Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?