Sysco Seattle Inc v. Teamsters Local Union No. 117 et al
Plaintiff: Sysco Seattle, Inc. and Sysco Seattle Inc
Defendant: Teamsters Local Union No. 117, Teamsters Local Union No. 135, General Drivers, Warehousemen and Helpers, Local Union No. 89, Teamsters Local Union No 117, Teamsters Local Union No 135 and General Drivers Warehousemen and Helpers Local Union No 89
Case Number: 2:2023cv00504
Filed: April 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 01851 m Labor/Mgt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2023 ***Civil Case Terminated per Plaintiff's #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (SS)
April 21, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Sysco Seattle Inc (Byergo, Anthony)
April 19, 2023 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendant Teamsters Local Union No. 117 on 4/6/2023, filed by Plaintiff Sysco Seattle Inc. (Byergo, Anthony)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (KMP)
April 4, 2023 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) General Drivers Warehousemen and Helpers Local Union No 89, Teamsters Local Union No 117, Teamsters Local Union No 135 (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (CR)
April 4, 2023 U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (CR)
April 3, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against defendant(s) General Drivers, Warehousemen and Helpers, Local Union No. 89, Teamsters Local Union No. 117, Teamsters Local Union No. 135 (Receipt # AWAWDC-7955062) filed by Sysco Seattle, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Local Union No. 117, #7 Summons Local Union No. 135, #8 Summons Local Union No. 89)(Byergo, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sysco Seattle Inc v. Teamsters Local Union No. 117 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sysco Seattle, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony B Byergo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sysco Seattle Inc
Represented By: Anthony B Byergo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teamsters Local Union No. 117
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teamsters Local Union No. 135
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Drivers, Warehousemen and Helpers, Local Union No. 89
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teamsters Local Union No 117
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teamsters Local Union No 135
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Drivers Warehousemen and Helpers Local Union No 89
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?