Sellar v. Woodland Park Zoological Society
Plaintiff: Carolyn Sellar
Defendant: Woodland Park Zoological Society
Case Number: 2:2023cv00627
Filed: April 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Tana Lin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relatio
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2023 Filing 13 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Carolyn Sellar, TO RESPONSE to #9 MOTION to Remand (Goldsworthy, Richard)
May 30, 2023 Filing 12 RESPONSE, by Defendant Woodland Park Zoological Society, to #9 MOTION to Remand . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reuben, Anne)
May 25, 2023 NOTICE of Re-Setting Deadlines re Parties' #11 Stipulated Notice. Pursuant to section II(G) of Judge Lin's Standing Order, the deadline for the FRCP 26(f) Conference is now set for 20 days after the Court issues its Order on the Motion to Remand, dkt. #9 ; the deadline for Initial Disclosures is now set for two weeks after the new deadline for the 26(f) Conference; and the deadline for the Combined Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan is now two weeks after the new deadline for Initial Disclosures. (LH)
May 24, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE Stipulated Notice to the Court ; filed by Plaintiff Carolyn Sellar. (Goldsworthy, Richard)
May 12, 2023 Filing 10 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Carolyn Sellar (Goldsworthy, Richard)
May 11, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand , filed by Plaintiff Carolyn Sellar. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/2/2023, (Goldsworthy, Richard)
May 8, 2023 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Woodland Park Zoological Society. (Reuben, Anne)
May 5, 2023 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint; by Woodland Park Zoological Society.(Reuben, Anne)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Tana Lin. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 5/30/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/13/2023, Joint Status Report due by 6/27/2023. (KMP)
May 2, 2023 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER (text only) made at the direction of Judge Tana Lin: The Court has posted Chambers Procedures at http://www.wawd.uscourts.gov/judges/lin-procedures. All counsel and unrepresented ("pro se") parties are DIRECTED to review them, if they have not already done so. Failure to follow the requirements set forth in the Chambers Procedures may result in the imposition of sanctions. (KMP)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455 AND CANON 3 OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Tana Lin. (KMP)
May 1, 2023 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (JWC)
May 1, 2023 Judge Tana Lin added. (JWC)
May 1, 2023 NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), Defendant must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 5/8/2023. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents. (JWC)
April 28, 2023 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Kristy Hulverson In Support of Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Woodland Park Zoological Society (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Hammond, Ryan)
April 28, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 23-3-05654-0 SEA; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7988956) filed by Woodland Park Zoological Society. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint (Exhibit 1), #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Summons (Exhibit 4), #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Hammond, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sellar v. Woodland Park Zoological Society
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Sellar
Represented By: Richard E. Goldsworthy
Represented By: Robin J Shishido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodland Park Zoological Society
Represented By: Anne E Reuben
Represented By: Jordan T Wada
Represented By: Ryan Paul Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?