Aguda v. American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Oluwatoyin Aguda
Defendant: American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2023cv00671
Filed: May 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES. Length of Trial: 7 days. Jury Trial is set for 9/9/2024 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 15106 before Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Joinder of Parties due by 7/31/2023, Amended Pleadings due by 3/13/2024, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 3/13/2024, Discovery completed by 5/12/2024, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 5/26/2024, Dispositive motions due by 6/11/2024, Motions in Limine due by 8/12/2024, Pretrial Order due by 8/28/2024, Trial briefs to be submitted by 9/4/2024, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 9/4/2024, Trial Exhibits due by 9/4/2024. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (VE)
June 22, 2023 Filing 10 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 7. (Kay, Kevin)
May 30, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint; by American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Kay, Kevin)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Joint Status Report due by 6/22/2023. (VE)
May 17, 2023 Filing 7 CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent American Family Insurance Mutual Holding Company for American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Kay, Kevin)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re Parties' #5 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant's Answer is now due by 5/30/2023. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
May 15, 2023 Filing 5 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , filed by Defendant American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Noting Date 5/15/2023, (Kay, Kevin)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Joint Status Report due by 6/8/2023. (VE)
May 10, 2023 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. JURY DEMAND - properly submitted state court jury demand on file (CR)
May 10, 2023 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (CR)
May 10, 2023 NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), DEFENDANT must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 5/17/2023. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents. (CR)
May 8, 2023 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Joseph DiJulio re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kay, Kevin)
May 8, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court JURY DEMAND by Plaintiff indicated in Complaint; from King County Superior Court, case number 23-2-06167-5 KNT; (Receipt # BWAWDC-8000391) filed by American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Kay, Kevin) Modified on 5/10/2023 to label state court complaint (CR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aguda v. American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oluwatoyin Aguda
Represented By: Randall C Johnson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin J Kay
Represented By: Thomas Lether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?