Alpenspruce Education Solutions Inc v. Cascade Parent Limited
Plaintiff: Alpenspruce Education Solutions Inc
Defendant: Cascade Parent Limited
Case Number: 2:2023cv00692
Filed: May 11, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 8/1/2023, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/18/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/25/2023. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (GC)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Cascade Parent Limited mailed on 5/12/2023 (Jacobson, Pam)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Cascade Parent Limited (MG)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (MG)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (MG)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Alpenspruce Education Solutions Inc. (Jacobson, Pam)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Cascade Parent Limited with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-8005572) Attorney Pam Kohli Jacobson added to party Alpenspruce Education Solutions Inc(pty:pla) filed by Alpenspruce Education Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through P, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons for Cascade Parent Limited, #4 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120))(Jacobson, Pam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alpenspruce Education Solutions Inc v. Cascade Parent Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alpenspruce Education Solutions Inc
Represented By: Ryan Edmondson
Represented By: Pam Kohli Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cascade Parent Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?