SEIU Healthcare 1199NW v. Cascade Behavioral Hospital LLC
Plaintiff: SEIU Healthcare 1199NW and Cascade Behavioral Hospital, LLC d/b/a Cascade Behavioral Health
Defendant: Cascade Behavioral Hospital LLC doing business as Cascade Behavioral Health
Case Number: 2:2023cv01309
Filed: August 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 01851 m Labor/Mgt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The matter is hereby dismissed, with the parties each responsible for their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (SB)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the Standing Order for Civil Cases Setting Trial Date, Related Dates, and Court Procedures ("Standing Order") (Dkt. No. #5 ), the Court HEREBY STRIKES the noting date for the parties' stipulated motion (Dkt. No. #26 ). This Minute Order does not strike the stipulated motion; rather, it strikes the noting date. The Court considers the stipulated motion upon filing. In the future, the Court expects the parties to comply with the terms of the Standing Order. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (SB)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Plaintiff SEIU Healthcare 1199NW. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Stipulated Dismissal) Noting Date 10/11/2023, (Kussmann, Kristen)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Temporary Restraining Order, entered in this matter on 9/27/2023, is hereby DISSOLVED. The Court further orders the parties or either of them to show cause, no later than 14 days from issuance of this order, why this matter should not be dismissed. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (SB)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Barbara J. Rothstein- Dep Clerk: Natalie Wood; Pla Counsel: Kristen Kussmann; Def Counsel: Garrett Garfield; CR: Marci Chatelain; ORAL ARGUMENT held on 9/27/2023 via Zoom videoconference re #17 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Counsel present oral argument. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's #17 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order, and enjoins closing on the sale of Defendant's hospital facility until such time as the Court rules on Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The bond will be set at $10,000, due to the Clerk of the Court no later than 9/29/23. (NAW)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff SEIU Healthcare 1199NW, TO RESPONSE to #17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Declaration of Melissa Staples)(Kussmann, Kristen)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE, by Defendant Cascade Behavioral Hospital LLC, to #17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Garfield, Garrett)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE OF HEARING: Oral Argument on #17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order set for 9/27/2023 at 11:00 AM (PST) via Zoom videoconference before Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. The Courtroom Deputy will contact the parties with the link. (NAW)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Cascade Behavioral Hospital LLC.(Garfield, Garrett)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER: The Court acknowledges Defendant's Notice of Intent to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Defendant may file such response, no later than 9/21/2023. Plaintiff may file a reply on the Motion for TRO, if it chooses, no later than 9/22/2023; a reply in support of the Motion for Preliminary Injunction is not necessary and should not be filed. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (SB)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE pursuant to LCR 65(b)(5) of Intent to Respond to Motion for TRO ; filed by Defendant Cascade Behavioral Hospital LLC. (Garfield, Garrett)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , filed by Plaintiff SEIU Healthcare 1199NW. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Melissa Staples, #2 Proposed Order Granting TRO)(Kussmann, Kristen)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DECLARATION of Richard Pannkuk filed by Defendant Cascade Behavioral Hospital LLC re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Garfield, Garrett)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DECLARATION of Margot Mokdessi filed by Defendant Cascade Behavioral Hospital LLC re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Garfield, Garrett)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DECLARATION of David Keys filed by Defendant Cascade Behavioral Hospital LLC re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Garfield, Garrett)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DECLARATION of Jessica Lincoln filed by Defendant Cascade Behavioral Hospital LLC re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Garfield, Garrett)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE, by Defendant Cascade Behavioral Hospital LLC, to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Garfield, Garrett)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/11/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/18/2023, Joint Status Report due by 10/25/2023. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (NAW)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Cascade Behavioral Holding Company, LLC for Cascade Behavioral Hospital LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Cascade Behavioral Hospital LLC. (Garfield, Garrett)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Garrett S Garfield on behalf of Defendant Cascade Behavioral Hospital LLC. (Garfield, Garrett)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against defendant(s) Cascade Behavioral Hospital LLC filed by SEIU Healthcare 1199NW.(Kussmann, Kristen)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by SEIU Healthcare 1199NW. (Kussmann, Kristen)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Cascade Behavioral Hospital LLC on 8/25/2023, filed by Plaintiff SEIU Healthcare 1199NW. (Kussmann, Kristen)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. (NAW)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Cascade Behavioral Hospital LLC (JWC)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (JWC)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), Plaintiff must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 9/1/2023. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents. (JWC)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Cascade Behavioral Hospital on 8/24/2023, filed by Plaintiff SEIU Healthcare 1199NW. (Kussmann, Kristen)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiff SEIU Healthcare 1199NW. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Jane Hopkins, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Kristen Kussmann) Noting Date 9/15/2023, (Kussmann, Kristen)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against defendant(s) Cascade Behavioral Hospital, LLC d/b/a Cascade Behavioral Health (Receipt # AWAWDC-8136953) Attorney Kristen L Kussmann added to party SEIU Healthcare 1199NW(pty:pla) filed by SEIU Healthcare 1199NW. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kussmann, Kristen) (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/25/2023 due to malformed PDF) (CDA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SEIU Healthcare 1199NW v. Cascade Behavioral Hospital LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEIU Healthcare 1199NW
Represented By: Kristen L Kussmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cascade Behavioral Hospital, LLC d/b/a Cascade Behavioral Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cascade Behavioral Hospital LLC doing business as Cascade Behavioral Health
Represented By: Garrett S Garfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?