Montana Retail Store Employees Health and Welfare Plan et al v. C&S Jones Group LLC
Plaintiff: Montana Retail Store Employees Health and Welfare Plan, Nicolai Cocergine and Danny Ma
Defendant: C&S Jones Group LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv01342
Filed: August 29, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Jamal N Whitehead
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Jones W. Charles, Registered Agent for C&S Jones Group LLC on 10/18/2023, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dwarzski, Noelle)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/1/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/15/2023, Joint Status Report due by 11/22/2023. Signed by Judge Jamal N Whitehead. (GC)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant C&S Jones Group LLC (CR)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRAECIPE to attach document (Summons) re #1 Complaint, by All Plaintiffs (Dwarzski, Noelle)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint, ; filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dwarzski, Noelle)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Judge Jamal N Whitehead added. (CR)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), Plaintiff Montana Retail Store Employees Health and Welfare Plan - must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 9/6/2023. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents.(CDA)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) C&S Jones Group LLC (Receipt # AWAWDC-8144201) Attorney Noelle E Dwarzski added to party Nicolai Cocergine(pty:pla), Attorney Noelle E Dwarzski added to party Danny Ma(pty:pla), Attorney Noelle E Dwarzski added to party Montana Retail Store Employees Health and Welfare Plan(pty:pla) filed by Montana Retail Store Employees Health and Welfare Plan, Danny Ma, Nicolai Cocergine.(Dwarzski, Noelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montana Retail Store Employees Health and Welfare Plan et al v. C&S Jones Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montana Retail Store Employees Health and Welfare Plan
Represented By: Noelle E Dwarzski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicolai Cocergine
Represented By: Noelle E Dwarzski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Ma
Represented By: Noelle E Dwarzski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C&S Jones Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?