McNae et al v. ARAG Insurance Company
Plaintiff: William McNae and Ronda McNae
Defendant: ARAG Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2024cv00211
Filed: February 15, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Tana Lin
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2024 Filing 16 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Ronda McNae, William McNae by ARAG Insurance Company.(Baker, Gabriel)
March 26, 2024 Filing 15 ANSWER to #13 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Ronda McNae, William McNae.(Ruiz, Isaac)
March 19, 2024 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) ARAG Insurance Company with JURY DEMAND filed by William McNae, Ronda McNae.(Ruiz, Isaac)
March 14, 2024 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint; , COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff All Plaintiffs by ARAG Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Baker, Gabriel)
February 29, 2024 Filing 12 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant ARAG Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Baker, Gabriel)
February 22, 2024 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint; by ARAG Insurance Company.(Roesch, Benjamin)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Tana Lin. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 3/21/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/4/2024, Joint Status Report due by 4/18/2024. (KMP)
February 22, 2024 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER (text only) made at the direction of Judge Tana Lin: The Court has posted Chambers Procedures at #https://www.wawd.uscourts.gov/judges/lin-procedures. All counsel and unrepresented ("pro se") parties are DIRECTED to review them, if they have not already done so. Failure to follow the requirements set forth in the Chambers Procedures may result in the imposition of sanctions. (KMP)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455 AND CANON 3 OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Tana Lin. (KMP)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Michael T Mullaly for DEFENDANT ARAG Insurance Company, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
February 21, 2024 Filing 6 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. JURY DEMAND - properly submitted federal court jury demand on file for plaintiffs. (RE)
February 21, 2024 Judge Tana Lin added. (RE)
February 16, 2024 Filing 5 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by All Plaintiffs (Ruiz, Isaac)
February 15, 2024 Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Michael T. Mullay FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant ARAG Insurance Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8354584 (Baker, Gabriel)
February 15, 2024 Filing 3 CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent ARAG SE for ARAG Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by ARAG Insurance Company. (Baker, Gabriel)
February 15, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE to Plaintiffs re #1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendant ARAG Insurance Company. (Baker, Gabriel)
February 15, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 24-2-00945-1; (Receipt # BWAWDC-8354382) filed by ARAG Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement Declaration of Gabe Baker and Exhibits)(Baker, Gabriel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNae et al v. ARAG Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William McNae
Represented By: David Fadduol
Represented By: Isaac Ruiz
Represented By: McKean J Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronda McNae
Represented By: David Fadduol
Represented By: Isaac Ruiz
Represented By: McKean J Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARAG Insurance Company
Represented By: Benjamin J Roesch
Represented By: Gabriel Baker
Represented By: Michael T Mullaly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?