Alzate v. Walmart Inc et al
Plaintiff: Kendra Alzate
Defendant: Walmart Inc., Conagra Brands Inc, DS Containers, Inc., Walmart Inc, DS Containers Inc, John Doe Manufacturers I-III and John Doe Distributors I-III
Case Number: 2:2024cv00290
Filed: March 1, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John H Chun
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2024 Filing 31 LETTER from Roger J. Ermola, II to Judge John H. Chun filed by Kendra Alzate (Ermola, Roger)
April 25, 2024 Filing 30 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 5-7. (Ermola, Roger)
April 11, 2024 Filing 29 PRAECIPE by Defendant DS Containers Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Corrected first page of Dkt. 27 - Motion to DIsmiss)(Cassel, Stuart)
April 11, 2024 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Kevin Richards in Support of Defendant DS Containers' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Defendant DS Containers Inc re #27 MOTION to Dismiss Party (Cassel, Stuart)
April 11, 2024 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss Party , filed by Defendant DS Containers Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order) Oral argument requested. Noting Date 5/3/2024, (Cassel, Stuart) Modified on 4/29/2024 to note oral argument requested, per Praecipe (Dkt. #29 ) (AD).
April 5, 2024 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on DS Containers, Inc. on 2/20/2024, filed by Plaintiff Kendra Alzate. (Ermola, Roger)
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting Defendant's #17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. The deadline for Defendant DS Containers, Inc. to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint shall be extended for 30 days from 3/12/2024, to 4/11/2024. Signed by Judge John H. Chun. (SB)
March 21, 2024 Filing 24 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Winters, Evelyn)
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge John H. Chun. Joint Status Report due by 4/24/2024, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 4/3/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/17/2024. (AD)
March 15, 2024 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal, by Conagra Brands Inc.(Silverman, Edward)
March 13, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Erin C Dyer for Plaintiff Kendra Alzate from 04/12/24-04/19/24; 06/10/24-06/21/24. (Dyer, Erin)
March 11, 2024 Filing 20 CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Daiwa Can Company for DS Containers Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by DS Containers Inc. (Winters, Evelyn)
March 11, 2024 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal, by Walmart Inc.(Silverman, Edward)
March 8, 2024 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Evelyn E. Winters filed by Defendant DS Containers Inc re #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Winters, Evelyn)
March 8, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , filed by Defendant DS Containers Inc. Noting Date 3/22/2024, (Winters, Evelyn)
March 6, 2024 Filing 16 DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1(a)(2). Filed by Walmart Inc. (Silverman, Edward)
March 6, 2024 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Walmart Inc. (Silverman, Edward)
March 6, 2024 Filing 14 DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1(a)(2). Filed by Conagra Brands Inc. (Silverman, Edward)
March 6, 2024 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Conagra Brands Inc. (Silverman, Edward)
March 6, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Dana C Kopij on behalf of Defendant Conagra Brands Inc. (Kopij, Dana)
March 5, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Edward M Silverman on behalf of Defendant Conagra Brands Inc. (Silverman, Edward)
March 5, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Xavier J Gardner on behalf of Defendant Conagra Brands Inc. (Gardner, Xavier)
March 5, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Xavier J Gardner on behalf of Defendant Walmart Inc. (Gardner, Xavier)
March 5, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Rodney L Umberger, Jr on behalf of Defendant Walmart Inc. (Umberger, Rodney)
March 5, 2024 Filing 7 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal,. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s).See attached letter for more information and instructions. cc via ad hoc, Attorney Umberger(CDA)
March 4, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Erin C Dyer on behalf of Plaintiff Kendra Alzate. (Dyer, Erin)
March 4, 2024 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (RE)
March 4, 2024 Filing 4 Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** No Signature - Secondary Attorney(s).See attached letter for more information and instructions. (RE)
March 4, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Evelyn E Winters on behalf of Defendant DS Containers, Inc.. (Winters, Evelyn)
March 4, 2024 NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), Defendant(s) Walmart Inc, DS Containers Inc, and Conagra Brands Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3/11/2024. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents. (RE)
March 4, 2024 Judge John H. Chun added. (RE)
March 1, 2024 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Eddy Silverman re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Walmart Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Silverman, Edward) Modified on 3/4/2024 to edit document title. (RE)
March 1, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 24-2-01199-4 SEA; (Receipt # AWAWDC-8373957) filed by Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 King County Superior Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Silverman, Edward) Modified on 3/4/2024 to edit document titles. (RE) (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/4/2024 due to malformed PDF) (RE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alzate v. Walmart Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendra Alzate
Represented By: Jonathan Yousling
Represented By: Roger J. Ermola, II
Represented By: Erin C Dyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Edward M Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conagra Brands Inc
Represented By: Edward M Silverman
Represented By: Dana C Kopij
Represented By: Xavier J Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DS Containers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Represented By: Edward M Silverman
Represented By: Rodney L Umberger, Jr
Represented By: Xavier J Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DS Containers Inc
Represented By: Evelyn E Winters
Represented By: Stuart A Cassel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Manufacturers I-III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Distributors I-III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?