Norton v. Barron
Petitioner: Daniel Norton
Respondent: R Caternolo and Howard C Barron
Case Number: 2:2024cv00540
Filed: April 18, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David W Christel
Referring Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2024 Filing 9 RETURN RECEIPT (Green Card) re service by certified mail executed upon U.S. Attorney General. (CJS)
June 7, 2024 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT (Green Card) re service by certified mail executed upon Howard Barron Warden, Federal Detention Center SeaTac. (TE)
June 4, 2024 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT (Green Card) re service by certified mail executed upon United States Attorney Office. (TE)
May 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SUBSTITUTING RESPONDENT AND FOR RETURN, 2241 PETITION. The Clerk shall arrange for service by Certified Mail upon Howard C. Barron, upon the United States Attorney General in Washington, D.C., and upon the civil process clerk at the Office of the United States Attorney for the Western District of Washington. The Clerk of Court is directed to substitute Howard C. Barron as the Respondent in this action. The Clerk is also directed to update the case title. Signed by Judge David W. Christel. ( #5 Petition and this Order mailed certified return receipt on 5/28/2024)(CJS)(cc: Petitioner via USPS)
May 8, 2024 Filing 5 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Daniel Norton (Receipt # TAC 2-00004690). (TE)
May 8, 2024 FILING FEE RECEIVED: $ 5, receipt number 200004690. (MIH)
April 29, 2024 Filing 4 Mail addressed to Daniel Norton returned as Undeliverable re Case/IFP Deficiency Letter. (TE)( #2 Case/IFP Deficiency Letter resent cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
April 22, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name Filed by Petitioner Daniel Norton. New address: c/o Frank Wolfe, 4712 West Powell Blvd, Unit N133, Gresham, OR, 97030. (dkt #2 remailed)(MW)
April 19, 2024 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Proposed Document(s). ***Action Required*** 2241/2254 Filing Fee Not Paid, Prison Trust Account Statement.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 5/20/2024 to correct IFP application (MW) (cc: Petitioner via USPS)
April 18, 2024 Filing 1 PROPOSED Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 USC 2241 filed by Plaintiff Daniel Norton. (MW) (no filing fee, no ifp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norton v. Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: R Caternolo
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Howard C Barron
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?