Zayas v. DeCamp
Plaintiff: Myriam Zayas
Defendant: Julie DeCamp
Case Number: 2:2024cv00640
Filed: May 6, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2024 Filing 12 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Myriam Zayas re #11 Order Revoking In Forma Pauperis Status on Appeal. (SB)
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Revoking In Forma Pauperis Status on Appeal. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SB) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
June 4, 2024 Filing 10 REFERRAL NOTICE FROM 9TH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS re #8 Notice of Appeal. This matter is referred to the district court for the limited purpose of determining whether in forma pauperis status should continue for this appeal or whether the appeal is frivolous or taken in bad faith. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a) (3); see also Hooker v. American Airlines, 302 F.3d 1091, 1092 (9th Cir. 2002) (revocation of forma pauperis status is appropriate where district court finds the appeal to be frivolous). If the district court elects to revoke in forma pauperis status, the district court is requested to notify this court and the parties of such determination within 21 days of the date of this referral. If the district court does not revoke in forma pauperis status, such status will continue automatically for this appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 24(a). This referral shall not affect the briefing schedule previously established by this court. (RE)
June 3, 2024 Filing 9 TIME SCHEDULE ORDER/USCA CASE NUMBER (24-3486) as to #8 Notice of Appeal filed by Myriam Zayas. (RE)
May 28, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEAL to Ninth Circuit (24-3486) re #6 Order Dismissing Case, by Plaintiff Myriam Zayas. IFP granted on 5/10/2024. (cc: USCA) (RE) Modified on 6/4/2024 to add CCA#. (RE)
May 23, 2024 Filing 7 PROPOSED Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Myriam Zayas. (SB)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Ms. Zayas' Complaint fails to state a claim upon which relief by this Court can be granted. Accordingly, the Court hereby finds and ORDERS that Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED. This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) (MJV)
May 10, 2024 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Julie DeCamp with JURY DEMAND filed by Myriam Zayas. (IFP Granted) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Email Transmittal) (MJV)
May 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Recommended for review by the assigned District Judge under 28 U.S.C. 1915 (e)(2)(B). Signed by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) (MJV)
May 8, 2024 Filing 3 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (KS) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
May 6, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge S. Kate Vaughan filed by Myriam Zayas. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 PROPOSED Summons, #4 Email Transmission of Case) (KS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zayas v. DeCamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myriam Zayas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie DeCamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?