Tran et al v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Tien Tran and Rebecca Tran
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2024cv00879
Filed: June 14, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2024 Filing 11 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from Eastern District of Washington, Spokane and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (RE)
June 20, 2024 Filing 10 Case transferred in from Eastern District of Washington, Spokane. Case Number 2:24-cv-00168-MKD. (RE)
June 20, 2024 Judge James L. Robart added. (RE)
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 STIPULATED MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) AND FORUM NON CONVENIENS. Case transferred to Western District of Washington. Case CLOSED. Signed by Judge Mary K. Dimke. (TNC, Case Administrator) [Transferred from waed on 6/20/2024.]
June 7, 2024 Filing 8 First MOTION to Change Venue (Stipulated by All Parties) by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 7/8/2024 Without Oral Argument before Judge Mary K. Dimke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Decl. of RB, #2 Affidavit Decl. of RB)(Best, Ryan) [Transferred from waed on 6/20/2024.]
May 31, 2024 Filing 7 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2024 at 09:00 AM in Richland Courtroom 189 via Video Conference before Judge Mary K. Dimke. (CV, Courtroom Deputy) [Transferred from waed on 6/20/2024.]
May 24, 2024 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Case, Bryan) [Transferred from waed on 6/20/2024.]
May 20, 2024 Filing 5 Clerk's ORDER OF RANDOM REASSIGNMENT. Judge Mary K. Dimke assigned to case. TEXT-ONLY ENTRY; NO PDF DOCUMENT WILL ISSUE. This text-only entry constitutes the order or notice by the Court. (AY, DQA) [Transferred from waed on 6/20/2024.]
May 20, 2024 Filing 4 Clerks Notice of Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent Form. Please Note: Declination of Consent Forms are not to be electronically filed with the Court. Parties wishing to decline consent of this assignment must complete and return the attached Declination of Consent Form to the Clerk of Court by the Case Management Deadline set for 5/30/2024. (TNC, Case Administrator) [Transferred from waed on 6/20/2024.]
May 17, 2024 Filing 3 State Court Documents received filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Case, Bryan) [Transferred from waed on 6/20/2024.]
May 17, 2024 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Case, Bryan) [Transferred from waed on 6/20/2024.]
May 17, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $405; Receipt #AWAEDC-4551948 Filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Case, Bryan) [Transferred from waed on 6/20/2024.]
May 17, 2024 Notice of Judge Assignment. Magistrate Judge James A. Goeke assigned to case. (TNC, Case Administrator) [Transferred from waed on 6/20/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tran et al v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tien Tran
Represented By: Ryan Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Tran
Represented By: Ryan Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Represented By: Bryan J. Case
Represented By: Grace Wan
Represented By: Sarah Demaree Macklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?