Hockman v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Dawn Hockman
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2024cv00894
Filed: June 21, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Fricke
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christopher Vieira on behalf of Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Vieira, Christopher)
June 24, 2024 Filing 3 CONSENT by all parties to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. (KAM)
June 24, 2024 Filing 2 Notice: Pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions Under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), Rule 3. Service, the Court hereby notifies the Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office for the Western District of Washington of the commencement of this action by transmitting to them this docket entry via Notice of Electronic Filing. If Plaintiff is proceeding pro se and is not registered to receive electronic notice of filings, this Notice will be delivered to plaintiff via U.S. mail. Per Rule 3, "the plaintiff need not serve a summons and complaint under Civil Rule 4." (CDA)
June 22, 2024 Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (CDA) Modified on 6/22/2024 re-docketed notice of Judge assignment due to system error. (CDA).
June 22, 2024 Judge Teresa L Fricke added. (CDA)
June 21, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security (Receipt # AWAWDC-8516319) Attorney Victoria B Chhagan added to party Dawn Hockman(pty:pla) filed by Dawn Hockman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chhagan, Victoria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hockman v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Christopher Vieira
Represented By: US Attorney Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Hockman
Represented By: Victoria B Chhagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?