Amazon.com Inc et al v. Does 1-20 et al
Plaintiff: Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon Technologies Inc and Amazon.com Inc
Defendant: Mike Ahlert, Berkcan Turkmenoglu, Bharath Kumar Gandhe, Justin Cook, Brandon Wong, Danielle Lantz, Sai Parvathareddy, Timothy Rodgers and Does 1-20 unknown parties doing business as Chin Chopa
Case Number: 2:2024cv01083
Filed: July 23, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Tana Lin
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2024 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Timothy Rodgers.(Rodgers, Timothy)
August 26, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE: Defendant Timothy Rodgers has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. The party was directed to enter their appearance in accordance with LCR 83.2. (KB)
August 14, 2024 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER (text only) made at the direction of Judge Tana Lin: The Court has posted Chambers Procedures at #https://www.wawd.uscourts.gov/judges/lin-procedures. All counsel and unrepresented ("pro se") parties are DIRECTED to review them, if they have not already done so. Failure to follow the requirements set forth in the Chambers Procedures may result in the imposition of sanctions. (KMP)
August 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455 AND CANON 3 OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Tana Lin. (KMP)
July 26, 2024 Filing 8 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Mike Ahlert. (MJV)
July 25, 2024 Filing 7 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by All Plaintiffs (MacNaughton, Bonnie)
July 24, 2024 Filing 6 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office. (KS)
July 24, 2024 Filing 5 Summonses Electronically Issued as to All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons) (KS)
July 24, 2024 Filing 4 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint. ***Action Required*** Copyright/Patent/Trademark Forms Omitted.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (KS)
July 24, 2024 Judge Tana Lin added. (KS)
July 23, 2024 Filing 3 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(MacNaughton, Bonnie)
July 23, 2024 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.com, Inc. for Amazon Technologies, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by All Plaintiffs. (MacNaughton, Bonnie)
July 23, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-8555244) filed by Amazon Technologies, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MacNaughton, Bonnie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amazon.com Inc et al v. Does 1-20 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Ahlert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkcan Turkmenoglu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bharath Kumar Gandhe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danielle Lantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sai Parvathareddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Rodgers
Represented By: Timothy Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20 unknown parties doing business as Chin Chopa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amazon.com Services LLC
Represented By: Tim Cunningham
Represented By: Bonnie Elizabeth MacNaughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amazon Technologies Inc
Represented By: Tim Cunningham
Represented By: Bonnie Elizabeth MacNaughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amazon.com Inc
Represented By: Tim Cunningham
Represented By: Bonnie Elizabeth MacNaughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?