GS Holistic LLC v. Dapara LLC et al
Plaintiff: GS Holistic LLC
Defendant: Matthew Cho, Phillip Cho and Dapara LLC doing business as Pacific Smoke
Case Number: 2:2024cv01226
Filed: August 11, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2024 Case Reassigned to Judge James L. Robart per email from Chambers. (MIH)
August 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (GMR)
August 15, 2024 Filing 5 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to all Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MIH)
August 15, 2024 Filing 4 Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Jury Demand Improperly Indicated.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (MIH)
August 15, 2024 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (MIH)
August 15, 2024 Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (MIH)
August 11, 2024 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates for Chris Folkerts. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by GS Holistic LLC. (Harris, Brett) Modified on 8/15/2024 add other affiliate name (CDA).
August 11, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-8581726) Attorney Brett C Harris added to party GS Holistic LLC(pty:pla) filed by GS Holistic LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120), #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Harris, Brett) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/15/2024) to replace malformed PDF (MIH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GS Holistic LLC v. Dapara LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GS Holistic LLC
Represented By: Brett C Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dapara LLC doing business as Pacific Smoke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?